This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 15:35:48 (UTC).

OPORTUN -V- ARREOLA

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 OPORTUN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ARREOLA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1040

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC.

Defendant

MARINA SANDRA ARREOLA

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170206-0797 $100.00; 170206-0797-CK Reference Number 55593

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2017
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 04/21/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF OPORTUN INC. FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; APPEARANCES:; OPORTUN INC. REPRESENTED BY YVONNE SANCHEZ.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: MARINA SANDRA ARREOLA; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:18; MARINA SANDRA ARREOLA HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; YVONNE SANCHEZ IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST MARINA SANDRA ARREOLA.; JUDGMENT FOR: OPORTUN INC.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MARINA SANDRA ARREOLA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,007.95 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $85.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,092.95; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); 11:20; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO MARINA SANDRA ARREOLA. PARTY SERVED ON 02/11/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $55.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • PARTY MARINA SANDRA ARREOLA UPDATED: ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170206-0797 $100.00; 170206-0797-CK Reference Number 55593

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.