This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 05:41:30 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC-V-LIZET SANCHEZ

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 OPORTUN INC-V-LIZET SANCHEZ was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1695

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC

Defendant

LIZET DAMARIZ GRANADOS SANCHEZ

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM & ORDER/AUTH TO APPEAR FILED AS TO LIZET DAMARIZ GRANADOS SANCHEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 11/05/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $55.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM & ORDER/AUTH TO APPEAR FILED AS TO LIZET DAMARIZ GRANADOS SANCHEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 11/05/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $55.00. (IMAGED)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0727 $100.00; 171004-0727-CK Reference Number 206956

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF OPORTUN INC FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF OPORTUN INC FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:13; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; OPORTUN INC REPRESENTED BY SENDI FREGOSO.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: LIZET DAMARIZ GRANADOS SANCHEZ; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; LIZET DAMARIZ GRANADOS SANCHEZ HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST LIZET DAMARIZ GRANADOS SANCHEZ.; JUDGMENT FOR: OPORTUN INC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: LIZET DAMARIZ GRANADOS SANCHEZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,446.65 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $155.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,601.65; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 12/13/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:13; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; OPORTUN INC REPRESENTED BY SENDI FREGOSO.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: LIZET DAMARIZ GRANADOS SANCHEZ; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; LIZET DAMARIZ GRANADOS SANCHEZ HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST LIZET DAMARIZ GRANADOS SANCHEZ.; JUDGMENT FOR: OPORTUN INC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: LIZET DAMARIZ GRANADOS SANCHEZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,446.65 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $155.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,601.65; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM & ORDER/AUTH TO APPEAR FILED AS TO LIZET DAMARIZ GRANADOS SANCHEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 11/05/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $55.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF OPORTUN INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0727 $100.00; 171004-0727-CK Reference Number 206956

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO B4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less