This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 14:22:55 (UTC).

ONTARIO -V- MORAN

Case Summary

On 07/22/2015 ONTARIO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MORAN. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5688

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONTARIO CNG STATION INC.

Defendants

PABLO MORAN

JULIA MORAN

 

Court Documents

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED.

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF ONTARIO CNG STATIONINC. FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF ONTARIO CNG STATIONINC. FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PABLO MORAN, JULIA MORAN FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PABLO MORAN, JULIA MORAN FILED.

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:40; CHARLES J UMEDA, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: D FERRIS; APPEARANCES:; ONTARIO CNG STATIONINC. REPRESENTED BY ATABAK YOUSSEFZADEH.; DEFENDANT PABLO MORAN, JULIA MORAN PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; AFTER MEDIATION, MATTER IS NOT SETTLED.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; ATABAK YOUSSEFZADEH IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; VICTOR RABIAN IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; VICTOR VALDEZ IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR DEFENDANT.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; WILLIAM MESCH IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR DEFENDANT.; OFFICER B RESCENDEZ IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR DEFENDANT.; WITNESS OFFICER B RESCENDEZ EXCUSED.; 12:00; COURT IN RECESS.; COURT RECONVENES AT 1:30PM; DEFENDANTS WITNESS WILLIAM MESCH RECALLED, STILL UNDER OATH.; WITNESS -- JULIA MORAN IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; 01:48; MATTER DEEMED SUBMITTED.; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET FILED AS TO JULIA MORAN; PARTY SERVED ON 09/01/15 WITH COSTS OF $15.00 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET FILED AS TO JULIA MORAN; PARTY SERVED ON 09/01/15 WITH COSTS OF $15.00 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 09/02/15 AS TO CHRIS MESCH, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 09/02/15 AS TO CHRIS MESCH, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 09/03/15 AS TO GABRIELA JIMENEZ, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 09/03/15 AS TO GABRIELA JIMENEZ, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SMALL CLAIMS SUBPOENA BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 08/31/15 AS TO VICTOR VALDEZ, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SMALL CLAIMS SUBPOENA BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 08/31/15 AS TO VICTOR VALDEZ, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SMALL CLAIMS SUBPOENA BY DEFENDANT ON 08/06/15 AS TO BRANDON RESENDEZ, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SMALL CLAIMS SUBPOENA BY DEFENDANT ON 08/06/15 AS TO BRANDON RESENDEZ, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO PABLO MORAN; PARTY SERVED ON 07/27/15 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO PABLO MORAN; PARTY SERVED ON 07/27/15 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 150722-2428 $77.50

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2015
  • SMALL CLAIMS SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO EACH DEFENDANT.; Minutes; Receipt: 150722-2445 $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • SATISFACTION RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 09/18/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; CHARLES J UMEDA, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS ON SUBMITTED MATTER:; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 07/22/2015 OF ONTARIO CNG STATIONINC. ORDERED ENTERED 09/15/15; JUDGMENT FOR: ONTARIO CNG STATIONINC.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: PABLO MORAN, JULIA MORAN; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $650.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $105.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $755.00; COURT FINDS THAT THE ACCIDENT HAPPENED ON PRIVATE PROPERTY; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF ONTARIO CNG STATIONINC. FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PABLO MORAN, JULIA MORAN FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SMALL CLAIMS SUBPOENA BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 08/31/15 AS TO VICTOR VALDEZ, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ONTARIO CNG STATIONINC. FOR COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 150903-1855 $1.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SMALL CLAIMS SUBPOENA BY DEFENDANT ON 08/06/15 AS TO BRANDON RESENDEZ, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO PABLO MORAN; PARTY SERVED ON 07/27/15 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • SMALL CLAIMS SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO EACH DEFENDANT.; Minutes; Receipt: 150722-2444 $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 150722-2428 $77.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F6

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.