This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 15:33:00 (UTC).

ONTARIO -V- GUERRERO

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 ONTARIO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GUERRERO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1028

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONTARIO MONTCLAIR SCHOOL EMPL FEDERAL

Defendant

ERIKA GUERRERO

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170206-0344 $50.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2017
  • ORDR OF DISCHARGE RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • ORDER OF DISCHARGE - CHAPTER 7 PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • NOTICE OF CHAPTER 7 BANKRUPTCY CASE - NO PROOF OF CLAIM DEADLINE PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 04/12/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF ONTARIO MONTCLAIR SCHOOL EMPL FEDERAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; ONTARIO MONTCLAIR SCHOOL EMPL FEDERAL REPRESENTED BY PHYLISS LUSSIER.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ERIKA GUERRERO; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:22; ERIKA GUERRERO HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; PHYLISS LUSSIER IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST ERIKA GUERRERO.; JUDGMENT FOR: ONTARIO MONTCLAIR SCHOOL EMPL FEDERAL; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ERIKA GUERRERO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $5,000.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $100.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $5,100.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); 10:26; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ERIKA GUERRERO. PARTY SERVED ON 02/09/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $50.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • E PAYMENT TRANSACTION NUMBER 6H177926P2254704T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170206-0344 $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F7

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.