This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 10:28:49 (UTC).

ONTARIO POLICE DEPT -V- KILLINGSWORTH, ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/26/2015 ONTARIO POLICE DEPT filed a Civil Right - Firearm Right lawsuit against KILLINGSWORTH. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0005

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Firearm Right

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ONTARIO POLICE DEPARTMENT

Respondents

ONE .308 CALIBER RIFLE, MODEL RUSSIA 5966

ONE 7.62 MM RIFLE,MODELRUSSIA1930,

ONE 7.62 MM RIFLE,MODEL RUSSIA 1930,

ONE .308 CALIBER RIFLE, MODEL RUSSIA 308

ADAM MICHAEL KILLINGSWORTH

ONE 7.62 MM RIFLE,MODEL RUSSIA 1938,

ONE .45 CALIBER SPRINGFIELD ARMORY

Other

DISTRICT ATTORNEY

San Bernardino, CA 92415

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BEST BEST & KRIEGER

2855 East Guasti Road Suite 400

Ontario, CA 91761

Other Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY

Attn: Kristen Caine 316 N Mountain View Ave

San Bernardino, CA 92415

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2015
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/JUDGMENT FILED BY ONTARIO POLICE DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • ORDER OF DEFAULT ON PETITION SEEKING JUDICIAL DETERMINATION RE: RETURN OF DEADLY WEAPONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • STATUS HEARING ON PETITION; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DONALD ALVAREZ, JUDGE; CLERK: MONICA REAL-RAMOS; COURT REPORTER ROCIO GONZALEZ 10911; COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY BENJAMIN HAMPTON PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; NO OTHER PARTIES ARE PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR STATUS HEARING ON PETITION.; NO OPPOSITION PRESENTED.; OTHER MENTAL HEALTH FILED 01/26/2015 OF ONTARIO POLICE DEPARTMENT IS GRANTED; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT FINDING, AFTER COURT TRIAL (MENTAL HEALTH); DISPOSITION COURT FINDING, AFTER COURT TRIAL (MENTAL HEALTH); STAGE AT DISPOSITION: PETITION GRANTED; DISPOSITION: PETITION GRANTED; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • DECLARATION OF BENJAMIN D. HAMPTON FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • NOTICE OF STATUS HRG 031215 FILED BY ONTARIO POLICE DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PETITION SEEKING FOR RETURN OF FIREARMS BY MAIL ON 01/26/15 AS TO ADAM MICHAEL KILLINGSWORTH, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • ON OTHER MENTAL HEALTH FILED 01/26/2015 OF ONTARIO POLICE DEPARTMENT FOR DISTRICT ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY DISTRICT ATTORNEY FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ADDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • ON THE OTHER MENTAL HEALTH FILED 01/26/2015 OF ONTARIO POLICE DEPARTMENT, DISTRICT ATTORNEY IS ADDED AS A THIRD PARTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • DECLARATION OF OFFICER SAM AVALOS IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • MENTAL HEALTH CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.