This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 18:16:25 (UTC).

ONTARIO NISSAN VS TORRES

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 ONTARIO NISSAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TORRES. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7474

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONTARIO NISSAN INC

Defendants

MARTHA VITELA

KARINA TORRES

 

Court Documents

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF ONTARIO NISSAN INC FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF ONTARIO NISSAN INC FILED.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0284 $100.00; 170927-0284-CK Reference Number 246830

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLA CLAIM FILED AS TO MARTHA VITELA. PARTY SERVED ON 10/08/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $54.50. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLA CLAIM FILED AS TO MARTHA VITELA. PARTY SERVED ON 10/08/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $54.50. (IMAGED)

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:41; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: COURTNE DOUGHERTY; BAILIFF: M PLESCIA; APPEARANCES:; ONTARIO NISSAN INC REPRESENTED BY LUISA RECINOS.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: KARINA TORRES, MARTHA VITELA; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; KARINA TORRES, MARTHA VITELA HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; LUISA RECINOS IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST KARINA TORRES, MARTHA VITELA.; JUDGMENT FOR: ONTARIO NISSAN INC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: KARINA TORRES, MARTHA VITELA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $266.50 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $139.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $405.50; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLA CLAIM FILED AS TO KARINA TORRES. PARTY SERVED ON 10/08/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $54.50. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLA CLAIM FILED AS TO KARINA TORRES. PARTY SERVED ON 10/08/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $54.50. (IMAGED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2018
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 180205-0511 $25.00; 180205-0511-CK Reference Number 248705

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( OVER THE COUNTER ) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 12/06/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF ONTARIO NISSAN INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:41; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: COURTNE DOUGHERTY; BAILIFF: M PLESCIA; APPEARANCES:; ONTARIO NISSAN INC REPRESENTED BY LUISA RECINOS.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: KARINA TORRES, MARTHA VITELA; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; KARINA TORRES, MARTHA VITELA HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; LUISA RECINOS IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST KARINA TORRES, MARTHA VITELA.; JUDGMENT FOR: ONTARIO NISSAN INC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: KARINA TORRES, MARTHA VITELA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $266.50 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $139.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $405.50; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLA CLAIM FILED AS TO MARTHA VITELA. PARTY SERVED ON 10/08/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $54.50. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLA CLAIM FILED AS TO KARINA TORRES. PARTY SERVED ON 10/08/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $54.50. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0284 $100.00; 170927-0284-CK Reference Number 246830

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • ON THE CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 09/27/2017 OF ONTARIO NISSAN INC, MARTHA VITELA IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less