This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 18:16:12 (UTC).

ONTARIO NISSAN VS ORTINO

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 ONTARIO NISSAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ORTINO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7473

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONTARIO NISSAN INC

Defendant

JOSHUA ORTINO

 

Court Documents

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO JOSHUA ORTINO. PARTY SERVED ON 10/04/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $89.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO JOSHUA ORTINO. PARTY SERVED ON 10/04/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $89.00.

WRITTEN REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING IS GRANTED, AS REQUESTED BY JOSHUA ORTINO.

WRITTEN REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING IS GRANTED, AS REQUESTED BY JOSHUA ORTINO.

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING CONTINUED -- NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING CONTINUED -- NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: KRISTIN CORNETT; BAILIFF: M PLESCIA; APPEARANCES:; ONTARIO NISSAN INC REPRESENTED BY LUISA RECINOS.; DEFENDANT JOSHUA ORTINO PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:37; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; THE COURT ACCEPTS AND APPROVES STIPULATION AND ORDER.; IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED THAT JUDGMENT SHALL BE ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:; JUDGMENT FOR: ONTARIO NISSAN INC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JOSHUA ORTINO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $475.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $119.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $594.00; MONEY JUDGMENT SHALL BE PAID AT THE RATE OF $50.00 PER MONTH BEGINNING 01/04/18. EACH PAYMENT THEREAFTER SHALL BE DUE ON THE 4TH DAY OF EACH FOLLOWING MONTH.; IF THE DEFENDANT SHOULD DEFAULT ON ANY TERMS OF THIS AGREEMENT, THE ENTIRE JUDGMENT SHALL BECOME IMMEDIATELY DUE.; 10:28; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; ; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0275 $100.00; 170927-0275-CK Reference Number 246829

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 12/28/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER HEARING TO COUNSEL OF RECORD; Minutes; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER HEARING TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF ONTARIO NISSAN INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • HEARING RE: FEE WAIVER REQUEST. COURT FEES FOR REQUEST TO POSTPONE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: KRISTIN CORNETT; BAILIFF: M PLESCIA; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER NOT RECORDED; THE COURT HAS READ AND REVIEWED THE DOCUMENTS SUBMITTED BY THE DEFENDANT.; COURT FINDS:; AFTER REVIEW OF THE APPLICATION AND/OR INQUIRY OF THE APPLICANT, THE COURT GRANTS THE REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES IN FULL.; CLERK'S OFFICE TO NOTIFY THE PARTY; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING CONTINUED -- NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING CONTINUED -- NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: KRISTIN CORNETT; BAILIFF: M PLESCIA; APPEARANCES:; ONTARIO NISSAN INC REPRESENTED BY LUISA RECINOS.; DEFENDANT JOSHUA ORTINO PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:37; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; THE COURT ACCEPTS AND APPROVES STIPULATION AND ORDER.; IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED THAT JUDGMENT SHALL BE ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:; JUDGMENT FOR: ONTARIO NISSAN INC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JOSHUA ORTINO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $475.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $119.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $594.00; MONEY JUDGMENT SHALL BE PAID AT THE RATE OF $50.00 PER MONTH BEGINNING 01/04/18. EACH PAYMENT THEREAFTER SHALL BE DUE ON THE 4TH DAY OF EACH FOLLOWING MONTH.; IF THE DEFENDANT SHOULD DEFAULT ON ANY TERMS OF THIS AGREEMENT, THE ENTIRE JUDGMENT SHALL BECOME IMMEDIATELY DUE.; 10:28; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; ; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • ORDER FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF FEES AND COSTS OF JOSHUA ORTINO IS DEN.; Disposition: DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • COURT ORDERS A HEARING REGARDING FEE WAIVER FOR JOSHUA ORTINO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY JOSHUA ORTINO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO JOSHUA ORTINO. PARTY SERVED ON 10/04/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $89.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 09/27/2017 OF ONTARIO NISSAN INC FOR ONTARIO NISSAN INC, ADD METRO NISSAN OF MONTCLAIR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0275 $100.00; 170927-0275-CK Reference Number 246829

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less