This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 18:15:55 (UTC).

ONTARIO NISSAN VS ESCAMILLA

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 ONTARIO NISSAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ESCAMILLA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7471

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONTARIO NISSAN INC.

Defendant

JOHN ESCAMILLA

 

Court Documents

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF ONTARIO NISSAN INC. FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF ONTARIO NISSAN INC. FILED.

STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT FILED.

STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0255 $100.00; 170927-0255-CK Reference Number 246826

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO JOHN ESCAMILLA. PARTY SERVED ON 10/04/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $89.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO JOHN ESCAMILLA. PARTY SERVED ON 10/04/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $89.00. (IMAGED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2018
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • JUDGMENT STATUS IS NOW SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 12/06/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF ONTARIO NISSAN INC. FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: COURTNE DOUGHERTY; BAILIFF: M PLESCIA; APPEARANCES:; ONTARIO NISSAN INC. REPRESENTED BY LUISA RECINOS.; DEFENDANT JOHN ESCAMILLA PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED THAT JUDGMENT SHALL BE ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:; JUDGMENT FOR: ONTARIO NISSAN INC.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JOHN ESCAMILLA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $375.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $119.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $494.00; MONEY JUDGMENT SHALL BE PAID AT THE RATE OF $82.00 PER MONTH BEGINNING 12/30/17. EACH PAYMENT THEREAFTER SHALL BE DUE ON THE 30TH DAY OF EACH FOLLOWING MONTH.; IF THE DEFENDANT SHOULD DEFAULT ON ANY TERMS OF THIS AGREEMENT, THE ENTIRE JUDGMENT SHALL BECOME IMMEDIATELY DUE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO JOHN ESCAMILLA. PARTY SERVED ON 10/04/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $89.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0255 $100.00; 170927-0255-CK Reference Number 246826

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F6

    Read MoreRead Less