This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 18:19:31 (UTC).

ONTARIO NISSAN VS BERMUDEZ

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 ONTARIO NISSAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BERMUDEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7483

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONTARIO NISSAN INC

Defendant

VICTOR BERMUDEZ

 

Court Documents

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF ONTARIO NISSAN INC FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF ONTARIO NISSAN INC FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO VICTOR BERMUDEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 10/04/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $89.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO VICTOR BERMUDEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 10/04/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $89.00.

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:37; TONY RAPHAEL, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; ONTARIO NISSAN INC REPRESENTED BY LUISA RECINOS.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: VICTOR BERMUDEZ; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; AUTHORIZATION FILED.; VICTOR BERMUDEZ HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; LUISA RECINOS IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST VICTOR BERMUDEZ.; JUDGMENT FOR: ONTARIO NISSAN INC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: VICTOR BERMUDEZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,405.43 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $139.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,544.43; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); 10:42; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0315 $100.00; 170927-0315-CK Reference Number 246822

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 12/05/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF ONTARIO NISSAN INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:37; TONY RAPHAEL, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; ONTARIO NISSAN INC REPRESENTED BY LUISA RECINOS.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: VICTOR BERMUDEZ; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; AUTHORIZATION FILED.; VICTOR BERMUDEZ HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; LUISA RECINOS IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST VICTOR BERMUDEZ.; JUDGMENT FOR: ONTARIO NISSAN INC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: VICTOR BERMUDEZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,405.43 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $139.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,544.43; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); 10:42; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO VICTOR BERMUDEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 10/04/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $89.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0315 $100.00; 170927-0315-CK Reference Number 246822

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less