Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 06:54:08 (UTC).

ONEWEST BANK -V- JUDITH MOORE

Case Summary

On 06/01/2010 ONEWEST BANK filed an Other lawsuit against JUDITH MOORE. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0034

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Appellant

JUDITH K MOORE

Respondent

ONEWEST BANK FSB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

, MELVIN NEAL

520 South Grand Ave Seventh Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Respondent Attorney

RUZICKA & WALLACE LLP

16520 Bake Parkway Suite 280

Irvine, CA 92618

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2011
  • STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2011
  • CASE DISPOSITIONED-JUDGEMENT WITH DECISION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2011
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: PER CURIUM OPINION FILED ON 12/21/10.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2010
  • APPEAL JUDGMENT IS AFFIRMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2010
  • JUDGMENT WITH OPINION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2010
  • MINUTE ORDER: HEARING ON APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2010
  • NTC OF HEARING ON APPEAL: 12/17/10 1:30 PM S-20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2010
  • CASE PREPD FOR DECEMBER CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2010
  • APPELLANTS REPLY BRIEF FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2010
  • CASE NUMBER CHANGED FROM ACI/AS100034

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2010
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ONEWEST BANK FSB FOR RESPONDENTS BRIEF; Minutes; Receipt: 100726-3445 $20.00; 100726-3445-CK Reference Number Respondent Brief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2010
  • APPELLANTS REPLY BRIEF DUE 8/16/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2010
  • RESPONDENTS BRIEF FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2010
  • CASE NUMBER CHANGED FROM ACI/ASAS1000034

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2010
  • APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2010
  • RESPONDENTS BRIEF DUE 7/25/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2010
  • SUPERIOR COURT # UDRS903631 - RANCHO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2010
  • NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED - APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF DUE 7/2/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2010
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - CT / 1 VOLUME ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2010
  • NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Onewest Bank NA is a litigant