This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 06:14:22 (UTC).

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL -V- ORTIZ

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 ONEMAIN FINANCIAL filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ORTIZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1768

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

Defendant

RAQUEL ORTIZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CRAMER, TODD L

4032 Bay Street Suite A

Fremont, CA 94538

 

Court Documents

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2017
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 170413-0144 $25.00; 170413-0144-CK Reference Number CK 24875

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( 3344.96 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ORDERED ENTERED 03/13/17; JUDGMENT FOR: ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: RAQUEL ORTIZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,014.96 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $305.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,319.96; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • DECLARATION OF JUDGMENT/USE OF ELECTRONICALLY SIGNED NOTE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • DECLARATION OF 1033 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST RAQUEL ORTIZ FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. AS TO RAQUEL ORTIZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/22/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2016
  • ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. FOR RAQUEL ORTIZ, ADD RAQUEL ORTIZ-RUIZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. FOR ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., ADD SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • PLAINTIFF ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 161221-0403 $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.