This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 13:33:47 (UTC).

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL -V- OGDEN

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 ONEMAIN FINANCIAL filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against OGDEN. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1536

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

Defendant

LEA ANN OGDEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CRAMER, TODD L

4032 Bay Street Suite A

Fremont, CA 94538

 

Court Documents

OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: ALMA HERNANDEZ; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY JOHN FARMER FOR TODD L. CRAMER FOR ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:53; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL.; REASON: PROOF OF FILING REJECTED BY CLERKS OFFICE FOR INCORRECT SPELLING, PLAINTIFF TO FILE; AMENDED PROOF OF SERVCIE.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : STATUS OF SERVICE/TSC SET FOR 07/30/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; 08:55; ACTION - COMPLETE

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO LEA ANN OGDEN SERVED ON 04/17/18 WITH FEES OF $69.50.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO LEA ANN OGDEN SERVED ON 04/17/18 WITH FEES OF $69.50.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO LEA ANN OGDEN WITH COSTS OF $69.50

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO LEA ANN OGDEN WITH COSTS OF $69.50

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO LEA ANN OGDEN WITH COSTS OF $40.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO LEA ANN OGDEN WITH COSTS OF $40.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO LEA ANN OGDEN WITH COSTS OF $69.50

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO LEA ANN OGDEN WITH COSTS OF $69.50

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO LEA ANN OGDEN WITH COSTS OF $69.50

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO LEA ANN OGDEN WITH COSTS OF $69.50

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 180823-0662 $25.00; 180823-0662-CK Reference Number 34056

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF SERVICE/TSC; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA JOANIS; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY JOHN FARMER FOR PLAINTIFF.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: LEA ANN OGDEN; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:48; COURT NOTES MOTION TO QUASH WAS PREVIOUSLY DENIED BY JUDGE DEST. DEFENDANT WAS GIVEN 10 DAYS TO; FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING AND HAS NOT.; PLAINTIFF COUNSEL TO PROCEED WITH DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT.; HEARINGS:; HEARING DATE OF 10/30/18 CONFIRMED.; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 08:50; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 10/30/2017 OF ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 10/30/2017 OF ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ORDERED ENTERED 07/26/18; JUDGMENT FOR: ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: LEA ANN OGDEN; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $10,424.87 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $300.00 COSTS $738.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $11,462.87; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 10/30/2017 OF ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. AS TO LEA ANN OGDEN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST LEA ANN OGDEN FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: USE OF COPY IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER DENYING MTN TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS BY MIAL ON 07/05/18 AS TO LEA ANN OGDEN, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • ORDER DENYING MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO LEA ANN OGDEN WITH COSTS OF $69.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 0.00 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 10/30/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171101-0644 $380.00; 171101-0644-CK Reference Number 29310

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $10,424.87

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less