This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 13:31:48 (UTC).

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES -V- COMPTON

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES -V- COMPTON was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1523

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

Defendant

SUZANNA COMPTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CRAMER, TODD L

4032 Bay Street Suite A

Fremont, CA 94538

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 171031-0043 $240.00; 171031-0043-CK Reference Number 29312

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/30/2017 OF ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/30/2017 OF ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/30/2017 OF ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ORDERED ENTERED 01/08/18; JUDGMENT FOR: ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: SUZANNA COMPTON; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $5,500.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $300.00 COSTS $309.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $6,109.50; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SUZANNA COMPTON; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/13/17 WITH COSTS OF $69.50 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SUZANNA COMPTON; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/13/17 WITH COSTS OF $69.50 FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON SUZANNA COMPTON.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON SUZANNA COMPTON.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

DECLARATION RE: USE OF ELECTRONICALLY SIGNED NOTE IN LIEU OF ORIGI FILED BY ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

DECLARATION RE: USE OF ELECTRONICALLY SIGNED NOTE IN LIEU OF ORIGI FILED BY ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 180123-0251 $25.00; 180123-0251-CK Reference Number 30376

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/30/2017 OF ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/30/2017 OF ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ORDERED ENTERED 01/08/18; JUDGMENT FOR: ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: SUZANNA COMPTON; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $5,500.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $300.00 COSTS $309.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $6,109.50; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: USE OF ELECTRONICALLY SIGNED NOTE IN LIEU OF ORIGI FILED BY ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON SUZANNA COMPTON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/30/2017 OF ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. AS TO SUZANNA COMPTON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/30/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SUZANNA COMPTON; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/13/17 WITH COSTS OF $69.50 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PLAINTIFF ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $5,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 0 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 10/30/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 171031-0043 $240.00; 171031-0043-CK Reference Number 29312

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less