This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/09/2018 at 09:26:58 (UTC).

OLINER -V- COTNEY/WALLACE

Case Summary

On 02/23/2017 OLINER filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against COTNEY/WALLACE. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0061

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RENEE OLINER

DOUG OLINER

Defendants

JOHN WALLACE

TERESA ANSON COTNEY

 

Court Documents

AMENDED WRIT RETURN AMENDING COST FROM 125.00 TO 145.00 * FILED.

AMENDED WRIT RETURN AMENDING COST FROM 125.00 TO 145.00 * FILED.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $125.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $125.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( HANDED OVER COUNTER)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( HANDED OVER COUNTER)

STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) FILED.

STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 01:00 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 01:00 HOURS.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JOHN WALLACE FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JOHN WALLACE FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JOHN WALLACE; PARTY SERVED ON 03/01/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JOHN WALLACE; PARTY SERVED ON 03/01/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY TERESA ANSON COTNEY; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY TERESA ANSON COTNEY; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON TERESA ANSON COTNEY; PARTY SERVED ON 03/01/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON TERESA ANSON COTNEY; PARTY SERVED ON 03/01/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170223-0472 $255.00; 170223-0472-MC Reference Number 026-0006127049

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170223-0472 $255.00; 170223-0472-MC Reference Number 026-0006127049

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED WRIT RETURN AMENDING COST FROM 125.00 TO 145.00 * FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $125.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( HANDED OVER COUNTER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170327-0449 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 01:00 HRS.; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; JOEL AGRON, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: KIMBERLEY HANNA; COURT REPORTER ROWENA MASIH 7426; BAILIFF: S LEACH; PLAINTIFF RENEE OLINER PRESENT; DEFENDANT TERESA ANSON COTNEY PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: DOUG OLINER; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JOHN WALLACE; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; WITNESS -- RENEE OLINER IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- TERESA COTNEY IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; JUDGMENT AS TO TERESA COTNEY; JUDGMENT ENTERED BY STIPULATION; JUDGMENT FOR: DOUG OLINER, RENEE OLINER; JUDGMENT AGAINST: TERESA ANSON COTNEY; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; NO LOCK OUT PRIOR TO 04/03/17.; CAUSE OF ACTION FOR MONEY DAMAGES SHALL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; JUDGMENT AS TO JOHN WALLACE; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 02/23/2017 OF DOUG OLINER ORDERED ENTERED 03/27/17; JUDGMENT FOR: DOUG OLINER, RENEE OLINER; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JOHN WALLACE; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: JOHN WALLACE. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; PLAINTIFF TO PREPARE JUDGMENT.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); ACTION DISPO: JUDGMENT; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170314-0589 $1.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170301-0957 $0.74

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • 4/17/17 8:01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • 4/17/17 8:01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • ADA LETTER MAILED OUT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • 4/17/17 8:01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4X

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170223-0472 $255.00; 170223-0472-MC Reference Number 026-0006127049

    Read MoreRead Less