This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 15:58:38 (UTC).

OLGA OLEA -V- AMANDA LEE AWAD

Case Summary

On 01/31/2017 OLGA OLEA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AMANDA LEE AWAD. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1989

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OLGA OLEA

Defendants

MAHER A AWAD

AMANDA LEE AWAD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SARRAF, RAYMOND

1875 Century Park East Suite 700

Los Angeles, CA 900672721

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET ON 8/02/17 AT 8:30 IN S25 - RESCHEDULED TO: IS RESCHEDULED TO AT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET ON 8/02/17 AT 8:30 IN S22 IS RESCHEDULED TO AT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • CASE RE-ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S22 FOR ALL PURPOSES. NOTICE OF RE-ASSIGNMENT SENT TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170207-0535 $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • PLAINTIFF OLGA OLEA FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY OLGA OLEA FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170203-0695 $435.00; 170203-0695-CK Reference Number 6468

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CERIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): DOCUMENT CANNOT HAVE WHITEOUT. PLAINTIFF/DEFENDANT NAMES ARE REVERSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.