This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/15/2018 at 02:29:33 (UTC).

Olga DC Mazariegos -N- Julio M. Mazariegos DeLeon

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 Olga DC Mazariegos -N- Julio M Mazariegos DeLeon was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8686

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

OLGA DEL CID MAZARIEGOS

Respondent

JULIO MOISES MAZARIEGOS DE LEON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 06/05/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 10/04/2017 OF OLGA MAZARIEGOS FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 10/04/2017 OF OLGA MAZARIEGOS ORDERED ENTERED 06/05/18; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED ON JULIO MOISES MAZARIEGOS DE LEON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JULIO MOISES MAZARIEGOS DE LEON FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 10/04/2017 OF OLGA MAZARIEGOS AS TO JULIO MOISES MAZARIEGOS DE LEON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JULIO MOISES MAZARIEGOS DE LEON; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/19/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY OLGA DEL CID MAZARIEGOS FOR PRELIM/FINAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY OLGA DEL CID MAZARIEGOS FOR FAX FILING FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 180525-0220 $6.00; 180525-0220-MC Reference Number 030-0065076911

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY OLGA DEL CID MAZARIEGOS IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON OLGA DEL CID MAZARIEGOS FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY OLGA DEL CID MAZARIEGOS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less