This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 13:25:08 (UTC).

OLFERT-V-EDISON INTERNATIONAL

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 OLFERT-V-EDISON INTERNATIONAL was filed as a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1482

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LONN OLFERT

JANICE OLFERT

Defendants

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPLANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUARDIAN LEGAL GROUP

201 N Brand Blvd Suite 200

Glendale, CA 91203

Defendant Attorney

DELORME, LISA

2244 Walnut Grove Ave 3Rd Floor

Rosemead, CA 91770

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2019
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE/STATUS OF SERVICE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; GILBERT OCHOA, JUDGE; (JUDGE AWAY); CLERK: ERIN MUELLER; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT L BRUCK; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY JOHN R FARMER FOR COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF.; LISA DELORME FOR SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAEDISON COMPLANY NOT PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR OSC RE STATUS OF SERVICE / TSC.; COURT ASSIGNS TRIAL READINESS AND TRIAL DATES.; MEDIATION TO BE COMPLETED BY 08/05/19.; SPECIALLY APPEARING COUNSEL TO SERVE COPY OF TRIAL REQUIREMENTS AND TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY; ORDER ON DEFENSE COUNSEL.; HEARINGS:; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 09/05/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S33; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 09/09/19 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S33 ESTIMATED DURATION OF - DAYS.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DEFENDANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAEDISON COMPLANY FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAEDISON COMPLANY FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 180614-0534 $435.00; 180614-0534-CK Reference Number 12745

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • ANSWER FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAEDISON COMPLANY; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LISA DELORME.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/30/2017 OF LONN OLFERT, EDISON INTERNATIONAL REMOVED AS A PARTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/30/2017 OF LONN OLFERT, SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAEDISON COMPLANY IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; GILBERT OCHOA, JUDGE; CLERK: KIMBERLY REYNOLDS; COURT REPORTER AZIZA AHMED 8440; COURT ATTENDANT L BRUCK; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY LAVONNA HAYASHI FOR PLAINTIFFS.; PLAINTIFF LONN OLFERT PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE/STATUS OF SERVICE SET FOR 08/06/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S33.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LONN OLFERT, JANICE OLFERT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE; Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0887 $435.00; 171030-0887-CK Reference Number 42057

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less