This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 21:59:31 (UTC).

OKAFOR -V- GEO GROUP

Case Summary

On 03/02/2015 OKAFOR filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against GEO GROUP. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2964

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NWORA K OKAFOR

Defendant

GEO GROUP INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

BURKE, WILLIAMS & SORENSEN LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2953

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFS MSJ/ADJUDICATION FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFS MSJ/ADJUDICATION FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON HEARING AT 120715 RE OSC FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON HEARING AT 120715 RE OSC FILED.

NOTICE OF HRG RE STATUS OF REMOVAL SENT.

NOTICE OF HRG RE STATUS OF REMOVAL SENT.; Minutes; PLEASE TAKE NOTICE THAT ALL HEARINGS HAVE BEEN VACATED. AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE STATUS OF; REMOVAL HAS BEEN SET FOR 12/07/15 AT 8:30 AM IN S32.; NOTICES PRINTED

NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY NWORA K OKAFOR, GEO GROUP INC. FEDERAL NUMBER 2:15-CV-00948 CJC-DTB.

NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY NWORA K OKAFOR, GEO GROUP INC. FEDERAL NUMBER 2:15-CV-00948 CJC-DTB.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY NWORA K OKAFOR IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY NWORA K OKAFOR IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFS MSJ/ADJUDICATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY NWORA K OKAFOR FOR FAX FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 170406-0142 $22.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 033-0014760186

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • CASE REMANDED TO STATE COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; WILFRED J SCHNEIDER JR., JUDGE; CLERK: KIM ALLAIN; COURT REPORTER KIMBERLY MORROW 9396; COURT ATTENDANT R BRUCATO; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: NWORA K OKAFOR; CHRISTOPHER KIM APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR GEO GROUP INC.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ALL DISCOVERY IS CLOSED IN THE FEDERAL COURT ACTION AND A MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS; CURRENTLY SET ON 9/12/16.; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: MATTER REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); COUNSEL FOR DEFEDANT TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • FILE SENT TO S32 FOR 09/02 HRG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON HEARING AT 120715 RE OSC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; WILFRED J SCHNEIDER JR., JUDGE; CLERK: KIM ALLAIN; COURT REPORTER DEENA MACIAS 9826; COURT ATTENDANT R BRUCATO; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: NWORA K OKAFOR; KRISTINA GRUENBERG APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR GEO GROUP INC.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT.; REASON: FEDERAL COURT TRIAL SET 8/16/2016; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 09/02/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S32.; COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2015
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 150310-0232 $4.00; 150310-0232-MC Reference Number 023-0224351325

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON NWORA K OKAFOR FOR FIRST APPERANCE FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY NWORA K OKAFOR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY NWORA K OKAFOR IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.