This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 14:27:28 (UTC).

OCAMPO VS HALL

Case Summary

On 01/31/2017 OCAMPO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HALL. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0752

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GUILLERMO OCAMPO

REBECCA OCAMPO

Defendants

KARMEL ROE

DARRYL HALL

DARRYL HALL AS INDIV

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES

474 West Orange Show Road

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

DEMURRER FILED BY KARMEL ROE; REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER(IMAGED)

DEMURRER FILED BY KARMEL ROE; REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER(IMAGED)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( OVER COUTNER)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( OVER COUTNER)

EX PARTE RE: SHORTENED TIME FOR DEMURRER FILED BY GUILLERMO OCAMPO, REBECCA OCAMPO

EX PARTE RE: SHORTENED TIME FOR DEMURRER FILED BY GUILLERMO OCAMPO, REBECCA OCAMPO; Minutes; Receipt: 170221-0863 $75.00; 170221-0863-MC Reference Number 031-0007356589

DECLARATION OF H.G. LONG FILED

DECLARATION OF H.G. LONG FILED

EX-PARTE MOTION RE; SHORTENED TIME; Disposition: GRANTED

EX-PARTE MOTION RE; SHORTENED TIME; Disposition: GRANTED; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY LUKE SINKINSON PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT KARMEL ROE PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:04; THE COURT HAS READ AND CONSIDERED EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR; HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO ADVANCE THE HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANTS DEMURRER AND/OR IN; THE ALTERNATIVE TO ADVANCE THE HEARING ON THE DEMURRER TO THE SAME DATE AS THIS EX-PARTE; APPLICATION.; WITNESS -- KARMEL ROE IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; GUILLERMO OCAMPO, REBECCA OCAMPO'S MOTION TO ADVANCE HEARING ON DEMURRER IS GRANTED.; VACATE L&M HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/16/17 AT 08:00 IN DEPARTMENT F7.; THE COURT HAS READ AND CONSIDERED NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT AND; OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT.; WITNESS -- KARMEL ROE IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF .; DEMURRER IS OVERRULED AS TO KARMEL ROE; 5 DAYS TO ANSWER.; HEARINGS:; COURT TRIAL ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 01/31/2017 OF GUILLERMO OCAMPO IS SET FOR 03/08/17 AT 08:00 IN DEPARTMENT F7; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; 09:16; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

DECLARATION RE: TELEPHONIC NOTICE FILED BY GUILLERMO OCAMPO, REBECCA OCAMPO

DECLARATION RE: TELEPHONIC NOTICE FILED BY GUILLERMO OCAMPO, REBECCA OCAMPO

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER SET FOR HEARING ON 03/16/17, FILED BY PLAINTIFF GUILLERMO OCAMPO, REBECCA OCAMPO (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER SET FOR HEARING ON 03/16/17, FILED BY PLAINTIFF GUILLERMO OCAMPO, REBECCA OCAMPO (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON DARRYL HALL; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 02/02/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON DARRYL HALL; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 02/02/17

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 02/02/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 02/02/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170131-0834 $255.00; 170131-0834-CK Reference Number 1166145

NOTICE OF RULING ON ADVANCE DEFENDANTS DEMURRER FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON ADVANCE DEFENDANTS DEMURRER FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY KARMEL ROE.

POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY KARMEL ROE.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

ANSWER FILED BY KARMEL ROE; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY KARMEL ROE; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST DARRYL HALL, DARRYL HALL AS INDIV, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST DARRYL HALL, DARRYL HALL AS INDIV, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

COURT TRIAL SET FOR UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 01/31/2017 OF GUILLERMO OCAMPO; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment

COURT TRIAL SET FOR UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 01/31/2017 OF GUILLERMO OCAMPO; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY LESLIE BORN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; GUILLERMO OCAMPO, REBECCA OCAMPO REPRESENTED BY OSCAR OCAMPO.; DEFENDANT KARMEL ROE PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:41; NO SETTLEMENT REACHED; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; PLAINTIFFS CASE IN CHIEF; OSCAR OCAMPO IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; MICHELLE NEVILLE IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; PLAINTIFF RESTS.; NO DEFENSE BY DEFENDANT.; DEFENDANT WALKS OUT OF COURTROOM; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 01/31/2017 OF GUILLERMO OCAMPO ORDERED ENTERED 03/08/17; JUDGMENT FOR: GUILLERMO OCAMPO, REBECCA OCAMPO; JUDGMENT AGAINST: DARRYL HALL, KARMEL ROE, DARRYL HALL AS INDIV, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $0.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $405.00 AND DAMAGES $2,999.88.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,904.88; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: DARRYL HALL, KARMEL ROE, DARRYL HALL AS INDIV, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); 09:51; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2017
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATIESFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • MOTION RE: DEMURRER 000100 FILED BY 0004; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( OVER COUTNER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 170308-0283 $25.00; 170308-0283-CK Reference Number 1166578

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 01/31/2017 OF GUILLERMO OCAMPO; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY LESLIE BORN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; GUILLERMO OCAMPO, REBECCA OCAMPO REPRESENTED BY OSCAR OCAMPO.; DEFENDANT KARMEL ROE PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:41; NO SETTLEMENT REACHED; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; PLAINTIFFS CASE IN CHIEF; OSCAR OCAMPO IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; MICHELLE NEVILLE IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; PLAINTIFF RESTS.; NO DEFENSE BY DEFENDANT.; DEFENDANT WALKS OUT OF COURTROOM; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 01/31/2017 OF GUILLERMO OCAMPO ORDERED ENTERED 03/08/17; JUDGMENT FOR: GUILLERMO OCAMPO, REBECCA OCAMPO; JUDGMENT AGAINST: DARRYL HALL, KARMEL ROE, DARRYL HALL AS INDIV, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $0.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $405.00 AND DAMAGES $2,999.88.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,904.88; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: DARRYL HALL, KARMEL ROE, DARRYL HALL AS INDIV, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); 09:51; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY KARMEL ROE; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST DARRYL HALL, DARRYL HALL AS INDIV, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON KARMEL ROE FOR FIRST APPEARANCE IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • KARMEL ROE ACCEPTS SERVICE BY FILING PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM ON 02/08/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED BY KARMEL ROE ON 02/08/17 ADDING PARTY AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $83.33.--BEGINNING ON 01/31/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170131-0834 $255.00; 170131-0834-CK Reference Number 1166145

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 01/31/2017 OF GUILLERMO OCAMPO, DARRYL HALL AS INDIV IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.