This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/09/2018 at 13:54:34 (UTC).

OCAMPO -V- COTTI FOODS CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 10/13/2016 OCAMPO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against COTTI FOODS CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6357

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARIA OCAMPO

Defendant

COTTI FOODS CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KINGSLEY & KINGSLEY

16133 Ventura Blvd #1200

Encino, CA 91436

Defendant Attorney

FISHER & PHILLIPS,LLP

4747 Executive Drive Suite 1000

San Diego, CA 92121

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT FILED.

FINAL JUDGMENT FILED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/13/2016 OF MARIA OCAMPO ORDERED ENTERED 02/28/17; JUDGMENT FOR: MARIA OCAMPO; JUDGMENT AGAINST: COTTI FOODS CORPORATION; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF $422,600.00. REFER TO JUDGMENT ON FILE FOR ADDITIONAL SPECIFICS.; ACTION - COMPLETE; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REQUESTING APPROVAL OF REPRESENTATIVE ACTION SETTLEMENT FILED.

JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REQUESTING APPROVAL OF REPRESENTATIVE ACTION SETTLEMENT FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 161013-0978 $435.00; 161013-0978-CK Reference Number 3479147

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL JUDGMENT FILED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/13/2016 OF MARIA OCAMPO ORDERED ENTERED 02/28/17; JUDGMENT FOR: MARIA OCAMPO; JUDGMENT AGAINST: COTTI FOODS CORPORATION; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF $422,600.00. REFER TO JUDGMENT ON FILE FOR ADDITIONAL SPECIFICS.; ACTION - COMPLETE; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REQUESTING APPROVAL OF REPRESENTATIVE ACTION SETTLEMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MARIA OCAMPO FOR STIP/ORDER; Minutes; Receipt: 170216-0178 $20.00; 170216-0178-CK Reference Number 3534032

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • STIP AND ORDER IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): JUDGES SIGNATURE CANNOT BE SEPARATED ON SINGLE PAGE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • DEFENDANT COTTI FOODS CORPORATION FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/13/2016 OF MARIA OCAMPO FOR COTTI FOODS CORPORATION, ATTORNEY FISHER & PHILLIPS,LLP ADDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY COTTI FOODS CORPORATION FOR 1ST APPEARANCE; Minutes; Receipt: 170127-0571 $435.00; 170127-0571-CK Reference Number D3535568

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • NOTICE AND ACKNOW OF RECEIPT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): MUST BE SUBMITTED WITH THE POS 010 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • NOTICE TO SUBMIT CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT; Minutes; PLEASE SUBMIT A CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT TO COMPLETE NEW FILING. IF YOU HAVE ANY QUESTIONS; PLEASE CALL 1 909 708 8678. THANK YOU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 161013-0978 $435.00; 161013-0978-CK Reference Number 3479147

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.