This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 15:02:28 (UTC).

Oasis Village -v- Webb/Mcdonald

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 a Property - Residential Eviction case was filed by Oasis Village -v- Webb Mcdonald in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2407

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oasis Village Lp

Defendants

Rayahn Webb

Plantesha K Mcdonald

Other

All Unnamed Occupants

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY ( 2663.76 ) (IMAGED)

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY ( 2663.76 ) (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY OASIS VILLAGE LP.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY OASIS VILLAGE LP.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $81.96), AND

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $81.96), AND

DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST ORIGINAL RENTAL AGREEMENT FILED.

DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST ORIGINAL RENTAL AGREEMENT FILED.

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 09/27/2017 OF OASIS VILLAGE LP GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: OASIS VILLAGE LP; JUDGMENT AGAINST: RAYAHN WEBB, PLANTESHA K MCDONALD; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $918.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $400.00 COSTS $535.00 AND DAMAGES $703.80.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,556.80; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION); Minutes; Receipt: 171020-0491 $25.00; 171020-0491-CK Reference Number 539637

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 09/27/2017 OF OASIS VILLAGE LP ORDERED ENTERED 10/19/17; JUDGMENT FOR: OASIS VILLAGE LP; JUDGMENT AGAINST: RAYAHN WEBB, PLANTESHA K MCDONALD, ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: RAYAHN WEBB, PLANTESHA K MCDONALD, ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON RAYAHN WEBB, PLANTESHA K MCDONALD, ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON RAYAHN WEBB, PLANTESHA K MCDONALD, ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS ON 10/02/17 WITH FEES OF $85.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS ON 10/02/17 WITH FEES OF $85.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO RAYAHN WEBB SERVED ON 10/02/17 WITH COSTS OF $85.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO RAYAHN WEBB SERVED ON 10/02/17 WITH COSTS OF $85.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON PLANTESHA K MCDONALD; PARTY SERVED ON 09/27/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $85.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON PLANTESHA K MCDONALD; PARTY SERVED ON 09/27/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $85.00

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0703 $255.00; 170927-0703-CK Reference Number 539112

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2018
  • ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 09/27/2017 OF OASIS VILLAGE LP FOR OASIS VILLAGE LP, ATTORNEY KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN ADDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY OASIS VILLAGE LP FOR WRIT; Minutes; Receipt: 180321-0623 $25.00; 180321-0623-CK Reference Number 322702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • WRIT MAILED TO ATTY IN SASE THIS DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY ( 2663.76 ) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY OASIS VILLAGE LP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $81.96), AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST ORIGINAL RENTAL AGREEMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 09/27/2017 OF OASIS VILLAGE LP GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: OASIS VILLAGE LP; JUDGMENT AGAINST: RAYAHN WEBB, PLANTESHA K MCDONALD; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $918.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $400.00 COSTS $535.00 AND DAMAGES $703.80.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,556.80; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • 585 JUDGMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS ON 10/02/17 WITH FEES OF $85.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO RAYAHN WEBB SERVED ON 10/02/17 WITH COSTS OF $85.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON PLANTESHA K MCDONALD; PARTY SERVED ON 09/27/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 09/27/2017 OF OASIS VILLAGE LP, ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $918.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $30.60.--BEGINNING ON 10/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0703 $255.00; 170927-0703-CK Reference Number 539112

    Read MoreRead Less