This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 15:02:12 (UTC).

Oasis Village-v-ceclilia Moraga

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 a Property - Residential Eviction case was filed by Oasis Village-v-ceclilia Moraga in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2405

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oasis Village L.P.

Defendant

Cecilia M Moraga

Other

All Unnamed Occupants

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SB)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SB)

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 03:05; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY CASS WATTERS PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; OASIS VILLAGE L.P. REPRESENTED BY AUTUNM DUTY.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: CECILIA M MORAGA; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM.; CECILIA M MORAGA HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; WITNESS -- AUTUNM DUTY IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST CECILIA M MORAGA.; JUDGMENT FOR: OASIS VILLAGE L.P.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: CECILIA M MORAGA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $918.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $425.00 AND DAMAGES $795.60.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,638.60; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: CECILIA M MORAGA, ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:30 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:30 HOURS.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER BY MAIL ON 10/02/17 AS TO KINBALL TIREY & ST JOHN LLP, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER BY MAIL ON 10/02/17 AS TO KINBALL TIREY & ST JOHN LLP, FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY CECILIA M MORAGA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY CECILIA M MORAGA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS ON 09/27/17 WITH FEES OF $85.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS ON 09/27/17 WITH FEES OF $85.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON CECILIA M MORAGA; PARTY SERVED ON 09/27/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $85.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON CECILIA M MORAGA; PARTY SERVED ON 09/27/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $85.00

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0672 $255.00; 170927-0672-CK Reference Number 539067

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SB)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 171031-0915 $25.00; 171031-0915-CK Reference Number 540159

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 03:05; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY CASS WATTERS PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; OASIS VILLAGE L.P. REPRESENTED BY AUTUNM DUTY.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: CECILIA M MORAGA; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM.; CECILIA M MORAGA HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; WITNESS -- AUTUNM DUTY IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST CECILIA M MORAGA.; JUDGMENT FOR: OASIS VILLAGE L.P.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: CECILIA M MORAGA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $918.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $425.00 AND DAMAGES $795.60.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,638.60; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: CECILIA M MORAGA, ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:30 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • PARTY ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS UPDATED: ALL UNKNOWNS

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CECILIA M MORAGA FOR FORMS; Minutes; Receipt: 171002-0210 $1.49

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 09/27/2017 OF OASIS VILLAGE L.P., ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS ON 09/27/17 WITH FEES OF $85.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON CECILIA M MORAGA; PARTY SERVED ON 09/27/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $918.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $30.60.--BEGINNING ON 10/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0672 $255.00; 170927-0672-CK Reference Number 539067

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B3X

    Read MoreRead Less