This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 07:36:10 (UTC).

OASIS PAWN-V-SBC WEIGHTS AND MEASURES

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 OASIS PAWN-V-SBC WEIGHTS AND MEASURES was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1835

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OASIS PAWN

Defendant

SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY WEIGHTS AND MEASURES

 

Court Documents

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:08; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; OASIS PAWN REPRESENTED BY DWIGHT KELLY.; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY WEIGHTS AND MEASURES REPRESENTED BY ALLEN LAMPMAN AND DEREK ARMSTRONG.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; NO SETTLEMENT REACHED; PLAINTIFF CASE IN CHIEF; WITNESS -- DWIGHT KELLY IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; PLAINTIFF RESTS.; DEFENSE CASE IN CHIEF; WITNESS -- ALLEN LAMPMAN IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; WITNESS -- DEREK ARMSTRONG IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DEFENSE RESTS.; EXHIBIT(S) RETURNED TO PARTIES.; CASE CONSOLIDATED WITH CASE(S) SMCBS1701636 FOR ALL PURPOSES MASTER FILE SMCBS1701636.; RULING WILL BE ISSUED IN MASTER FILE; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ; STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- CONSOLIDATED.; DISPOSITION: CONSOLIDATION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0545 $30.00; 171030-0545-MC Reference Number 026-0075796746

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY WEIGHTS AND MEASURES. PARTY SERVED ON 12/08/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $55.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY WEIGHTS AND MEASURES. PARTY SERVED ON 12/08/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $55.00.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:08; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; OASIS PAWN REPRESENTED BY DWIGHT KELLY.; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY WEIGHTS AND MEASURES REPRESENTED BY ALLEN LAMPMAN AND DEREK ARMSTRONG.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; NO SETTLEMENT REACHED; PLAINTIFF CASE IN CHIEF; WITNESS -- DWIGHT KELLY IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; PLAINTIFF RESTS.; DEFENSE CASE IN CHIEF; WITNESS -- ALLEN LAMPMAN IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; WITNESS -- DEREK ARMSTRONG IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DEFENSE RESTS.; EXHIBIT(S) RETURNED TO PARTIES.; CASE CONSOLIDATED WITH CASE(S) SMCBS1701636 FOR ALL PURPOSES MASTER FILE SMCBS1701636.; RULING WILL BE ISSUED IN MASTER FILE; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ; STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- CONSOLIDATED.; DISPOSITION: CONSOLIDATION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY WEIGHTS AND MEASURES. PARTY SERVED ON 12/08/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $55.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF OASIS PAWN FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0545 $30.00; 171030-0545-MC Reference Number 026-0075796746

    Read MoreRead Less