Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/12/2018 at 04:12:40 (UTC).

NUNEZ -V- TREMOR ENTERPRISES, ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/17/2015 NUNEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against TREMOR ENTERPRISES. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1684

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUANITA NUNEZ

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

TREMOR ENTERPRISES, INC.

ULTIMATE LOGISTICSENTERPRISE,INC.

JOSE IVAN GARCIA

SINGSUNNY LLC

ULTIMATE LOGISTICSENTERPRISESLLC

POWER CHAIN MANAGEMENT INC

XINGHUI INTERNATIONAL INC

Cross Defendants

EMPIRE PERSONNEL

RISHON, INC.

CALIBER GROUP STAFFING, INC.

TIRE STAFFING, A NEVADA CORPORATION WHICH

CATHY HALAZSI

YARON HALASCHCHI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BONONI LAW GROUP, LLP

301 N. Lake Avenue Suite 820

Pasadena, CA 91101

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

CURD, GALINDO, SMITH

301 E Ocean Blvd Ste 1700

Long Beach, CA 90802

SINGER, JEFFREY B

18000 Studebaker Rd. Ste.#700

Cerritos, CA 90703-2684

 

Court Documents

ORDER DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FILED

ORDER DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FILED

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO TIRE STAFFING, A NEVADA CORPORATION WHICH SERVED ON 09/06/17 WITH FEES OF $114.24.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO TIRE STAFFING, A NEVADA CORPORATION WHICH SERVED ON 09/06/17 WITH FEES OF $114.24.

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY TREMOR ENTERPRISES,INC..

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY TREMOR ENTERPRISES,INC..

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CATHY HALAZSI; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 06/17/17 WITH COSTS OF $112.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CATHY HALAZSI; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 06/17/17 WITH COSTS OF $112.00 FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 08/17/2015 OF JUANITA NUNEZ FILED BY JUANITA NUNEZ, WITH PREJUDICE.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 08/17/2015 OF JUANITA NUNEZ FILED BY JUANITA NUNEZ, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF JUANITA NUNEZ, ON 06/28/16

REPLY TO ISO TO MOTION RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER SET FOR HEARING ON 05/10/16 FILED BY JUANITA NUNEZ. (IMAGED)

REPLY TO ISO TO MOTION RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER SET FOR HEARING ON 05/10/16 FILED BY JUANITA NUNEZ. (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER SET FOR HEARING ON 05/10/16, FILED BY DEFENDANT JOSE IVAN GARCIA (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER SET FOR HEARING ON 05/10/16, FILED BY DEFENDANT JOSE IVAN GARCIA (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO QUASH SET FOR HEARING ON 05/10/16, FILED BY DEFENDANT TREMOR ENTERPRISES,INC., ULTIMATE LOGISTICSENTERPRISE,INC. (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO QUASH SET FOR HEARING ON 05/10/16, FILED BY DEFENDANT TREMOR ENTERPRISES,INC., ULTIMATE LOGISTICSENTERPRISE,INC. (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER SET FOR HEARING ON 05/10/16, FILED BY PLAINTIFF JUANITA NUNEZ (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER SET FOR HEARING ON 05/10/16, FILED BY PLAINTIFF JUANITA NUNEZ (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 160404-0301 $90.00; 160404-0301-CK Reference Number 11232

MOTION RE: FOR AN ORDER QUASHING DEFENDANT JOSE IVAN GARCIAS SET FOR HEARING ON 05/10/16, FILED BY PLAINTIFF JUANITA NUNEZ (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: FOR AN ORDER QUASHING DEFENDANT JOSE IVAN GARCIAS SET FOR HEARING ON 05/10/16, FILED BY PLAINTIFF JUANITA NUNEZ (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF RULING ON 032416 FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON 032416 FILED.

GENERAL DENIAL FILED BY JOSE IVAN GARCIA; REPRESENTED BY ATTORNEY JEFFREY B SINGER.

GENERAL DENIAL FILED BY JOSE IVAN GARCIA; REPRESENTED BY ATTORNEY JEFFREY B SINGER.

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER SET FOR HEARING ON 10/28/15, FILED BY PLAINTIFF JUANITA NUNEZ (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER SET FOR HEARING ON 10/28/15, FILED BY PLAINTIFF JUANITA NUNEZ (IMAGED)

DEMURRER FILED BY JOSE IVAN GARCIA; REPRESENTED BY JEFFREY B SINGER(IMAGED)

DEMURRER FILED BY JOSE IVAN GARCIA; REPRESENTED BY JEFFREY B SINGER(IMAGED)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 150817-1679 $435.00; 150817-1679-CK Reference Number 10697

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2018
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • COURT JUDGMENT PACKET IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CIV-100 MUST BE COMPLETED AND PARTIES MUST BE LISTED AS SUED AND MATCH JUDGMEN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • HEARING RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DONNA GUNNELL GARZA, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA GABLE; NOT REPORTED; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THE COURT HAS RECEIVED AND REVIEWED THE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES FILED 08/29/17 BY DEFENDANTS. THE; COURT DEEMS CASE NUMBER CIVDS1511684 RELATED TO CASE NUMBER CIVDS1508507 FOR DISCOVERY PURPOSES; ONLY. THE COURT DOES NOT ORDER THE CONSOLIDATION OF ANY OF THESE CASES. ALL RELATED CASE TO BE; TRANSFERRED TO DEPARTMENT S24 AS PRESENTLY SET.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE; ; MATTER TRANSFERRED TO DEPARTMENT S24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST TIRE STAFFING, A NEVADA CORPORATION WHICH FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON 1ST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF TREMOR ENTERPRISES,INC. AS TO TIRE STAFFING, A NEVADA CORPORATION WHICH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
101 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2015
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JOSE IVAN GARCIA FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 150930-0420 $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JOSE IVAN GARCIA FOR COURT REPORTER FEE FOR DEMURRER; Minutes; Receipt: 150930-0423 $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • FILING FEE PAID BY TREMOR ENTERPRISES,INC., ULTIMATE LOGISTICSENTERPRISE,INC. FOR ANSWER; Minutes; Receipt: 150921-1734 $870.00; 150921-1734-CK Reference Number 1775

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY TREMOR ENTERPRISES,INC., ULTIMATE LOGISTICSENTERPRISE,INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY CURD, GALINDO, SMITH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • DEFENDANT TREMOR ENTERPRISES,INC., ULTIMATE LOGISTICSENTERPRISE,INC. FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 150817-1679 $435.00; 150817-1679-CK Reference Number 10697

    Read MoreRead Less