This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 06:10:37 (UTC).

NULEVEL PARTNERS -V- MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 NULEVEL PARTNERS -V- MARTINEZ was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4705

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NULEVEL PARTNERS INC

Defendants

CARMEN MARTINEZ

KATIE MARTINEZ

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES

474 West Orange Show Road

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON CARMEN MARTINEZ; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 07/11/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON CARMEN MARTINEZ; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 07/11/17

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF NULEVEL PARTNERS INC ORDERED ENTERED 07/25/17; JUDGMENT FOR: NULEVEL PARTNERS INC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: CARMEN MARTINEZ, KATIE MARTINEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: CARMEN MARTINEZ, KATIE MARTINEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170718-0392 $255.00; 170718-0392-CK Reference Number 1174792

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLAED IN ATTY BIN)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLAED IN ATTY BIN)

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON CARMEN MARTINEZ, KATIE MARTINEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON CARMEN MARTINEZ, KATIE MARTINEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON KATIE MARTINEZ; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 07/11/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON KATIE MARTINEZ; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 07/11/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/11/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/11/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLAED IN ATTY BIN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 170802-0661 $25.00; 170802-0661-CK Reference Number 1176832

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF NULEVEL PARTNERS INC ORDERED ENTERED 07/25/17; JUDGMENT FOR: NULEVEL PARTNERS INC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: CARMEN MARTINEZ, KATIE MARTINEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: CARMEN MARTINEZ, KATIE MARTINEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON CARMEN MARTINEZ, KATIE MARTINEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF NULEVEL PARTNERS INC AS TO CARMEN MARTINEZ, KATIE MARTINEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON CARMEN MARTINEZ; PARTY SERVED ON 07/11/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON KATIE MARTINEZ; PARTY SERVED ON 07/11/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/11/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF NULEVEL PARTNERS INC, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $26.66.--BEGINNING ON 07/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $510.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170718-0392 $255.00; 170718-0392-CK Reference Number 1174792

    Read MoreRead Less