This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 05:12:03 (UTC).

NOVA POINTE -V- FOSTER

Case Summary

On 12/30/2016 NOVA POINTE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against FOSTER. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9208

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NOVA POINTE, LP A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNER

Defendant

CHONITA FOSTER

Assignee

FIDELITY CAPITAL HOLDINGS, INC., A CALIFORN

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM M GARRETT,JR

463 N. Sierra Way

San Bernardino, CA 92410

Assignee Attorney

KENNEDY, MATTHEW F

441 N Varney St 2Nd Floor

Burbank, CA 91502

 

Court Documents

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 161230-0390 $255.00; 161230-0390-CK Reference Number 58163

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY CHONITA FOSTER; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY CHONITA FOSTER; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT FILED.

STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT FILED.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( ISSUED AT COUNTER)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( ISSUED AT COUNTER)

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 12/30/2016 OF NOVA POINTE, LP A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNER FILED ADDING FIDELITY CAPITAL HOLDINGS, INC., A CALIFORN AS THE ASSIGNEE OF THIS JUDGMENT.

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 12/30/2016 OF NOVA POINTE, LP A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNER FILED ADDING FIDELITY CAPITAL HOLDINGS, INC., A CALIFORN AS THE ASSIGNEE OF THIS JUDGMENT.

ASSIGNEE OF RECORDS APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL FILED.

ASSIGNEE OF RECORDS APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketACK ASSIGN JUDG/ASSIGN RECORD APPOINT COUNSEL RECEIVED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASSIGNEE OF RECORDS APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 12/30/2016 OF NOVA POINTE, LP A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNER FILED ADDING FIDELITY CAPITAL HOLDINGS, INC., A CALIFORN AS THE ASSIGNEE OF THIS JUDGMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • DocketSTATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( ISSUED AT COUNTER)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • DocketWRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 170215-0048 $25.00; 170215-0048-CK Reference Number 58402

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • DocketCOURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:15 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: KRISTIN CORNETT; BAILIFF: M PLESCIA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY WILLIAM GARRETT PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT CHONITA FOSTER PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER NOT RECORDED; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; THE COURT ACCEPTS AND APPROVES STIPULATION AND ORDER.; IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED THAT JUDGMENT SHALL BE ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:; JUDGMENT FOR: NOVA POINTE, LP A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNER; JUDGMENT AGAINST: CHONITA FOSTER, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $685.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $355.00 AND DAMAGES $1,056.16.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,596.16; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; NO LOCK OUT PRIOR TO 03/08/17.; CASE SEALED; ACTION - COMPLETE; ; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY CHONITA FOSTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY CHONITA FOSTER IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER FILED BY CHONITA FOSTER; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • DocketDECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $22.96.--BEGINNING ON 01/01/17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • DocketPAST DUE RENT IS $685.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 161230-0390 $255.00; 161230-0390-CK Reference Number 58163

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NOVA POINTE, LP A DELAWARE LIMITED is a litigant

Latest cases where FIDELITY CAPITAL HOLDINGS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA F is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KENNEDY, MATTHEW F