This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/14/2021 at 08:22:00 (UTC).

NORTHERN CALIFORNA COLLECTION-V-PREMIER

Case Summary

On 10/19/2017 NORTHERN CALIFORNA COLLECTION-V-PREMIER was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0766

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTIONSERVICE

NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTION SERVICE , INC

Defendant

PREMIER REINFORCING, INC

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STEVEN D. CRIBB

700 Leisure Lane

Sacramento, CA 95815

Cribb, Steven Douglas

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF COMPUTATION OF INTEREST FILED

DECLARATION OF COMPUTATION OF INTEREST FILED

DECLARATION OF COMPUTATION OF INTEREST FILED

DECLARATION OF COMPUTATION OF INTEREST FILED

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM L

09/13/2018: LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM L

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

02/13/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

DECLARATION OF COMPUTATION OF INTEREST FILED

12/28/2017: DECLARATION OF COMPUTATION OF INTEREST FILED

DECLARATION OF COMPUTATION OF INTEREST FILED

12/28/2017: DECLARATION OF COMPUTATION OF INTEREST FILED

DECLARATION OF 1717.5 FILED

12/28/2017: DECLARATION OF 1717.5 FILED

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF NORTHE

12/28/2017: DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF NORTHE

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

12/07/2017: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

10/19/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

10/19/2017: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

NOTICE IMAGED

10/19/2017: NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

10/19/2017: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Returned - Los Angeles; Comment: LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED PARTIALLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $40.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketJudgment Filed - Status is now:; Comment: JUDGMENT STATUS IS NOW SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcknowlgmt of Satisfaction of Jmnt Filed - Fully Satisfied; Comment: ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; JUDGMENT IS FULLY SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $69,714.65

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Original Type: Trial Setting Conference; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20180222-0113; ConversionPayment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTIONSERVICE FOR WRIT OF EXECUTION 180222-0113-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 180222-0113-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 021990

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Los Angeles; Comment: WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. ( 69739.65 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of; Comment: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $661.85)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2017
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20171023-0357; ConversionPayment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $460.00; Total Payments and Credits: $460.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTIONSERVICE FOR FIRST PAPER FEE 171023-0357-CK CVH/ 435.00 PAYMT 171023-0357-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 21543

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTION SERVICE INC. is a litigant