This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 13:06:36 (UTC).

NORTH-V-SUPERIOR HAULING(COMPLEX)

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 NORTH-V-SUPERIOR HAULING COMPLEX was filed as a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1378

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERT NORTH

Defendants

BLANCA SANCHEZ

SUPERIOR HAULING AND FAST TRANSIT, INC

NICHOLAS FLORES

INTERMODAL DRAYAGESERVICES, INC, A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STRAUSS & STRAUSS,APC

121 North Fir Street, Suite F

Ventura, CA 93001

Defendant Attorneys

HANSON BRIDGETT LLP

425 Market St 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

FOSTER EMPLOYMENT LAW

3000 Lakeshore Ave

Oakland, CA 94610

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF COURTS TRIAL SETTLING CONF. FILED BY ROBERT NORTH.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF COURTS TRIAL SETTLING CONF. FILED BY ROBERT NORTH.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT/CASE MANAGEMENT BY MAIL ON 04/12/18 AS TO ATTYS FOR PLA, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT/CASE MANAGEMENT BY MAIL ON 04/12/18 AS TO ATTYS FOR PLA, FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY SUPERIOR HAULING AND FAST TRANSIT, INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY HANSON BRIDGETT LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY SUPERIOR HAULING AND FAST TRANSIT, INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY HANSON BRIDGETT LLP.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF ROBERT NORTH - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF ROBERT NORTH - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF ROBERT NORTH

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF ROBERT NORTH

ANSWER FILED BY SUPERIOR HAULING AND FAST TRANSIT, INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY HANSON BRIDGETT LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY SUPERIOR HAULING AND FAST TRANSIT, INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY HANSON BRIDGETT LLP.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO BLANCA SANCHEZ SERVED ON 11/21/17 WITH FEES OF $85.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO BLANCA SANCHEZ SERVED ON 11/21/17 WITH FEES OF $85.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SUPERIOR HAULING AND FAST TRANSIT, INC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/20/17 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SUPERIOR HAULING AND FAST TRANSIT, INC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/20/17 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON NICHOLAS FLORES; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/20/17 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON NICHOLAS FLORES; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/20/17 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0112 $435.00; 171030-0112-CK Reference Number 4217

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2018
  • COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • JOINT STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • FEES TAKEN FOR STIP/ STIP DROPPED NOT PROCESSED *

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY SUPERIOR HAULING AND FAST TRANSIT, INC FOR STIP/ORDER; Minutes; Receipt: 180816-0669 $20.00; 180816-0669-CK Reference Number 131100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: NADYA AVAKIAN; COURT REPORTER REGINA VEGA 12612; COURT ATTENDANT CHRISTIAN HERNANDEZ; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ARIS KARAKALOS APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR ROBERT NORTH.; ATTORNEY LISA POOLEY APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR SUPERIOR HAULING AND FAST TRANSIT, INC.; ATTORNEY MICHAEL WILBUR APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR INTERMODAL DRAYAGESERVICES, INC, A.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.; PURSUANT TO STIPULATION OF COUNSEL:; STAY ON DISCOVERY TO REMAIN UNTIL AFTER PARTIES CONDUCT MEDIATION.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF AND DEFENSE COUNSEL.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 10/02/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • ANSWER FILED BY INTERMODAL DRAYAGESERVICES, INC, A; PARTY REPRESENTED BY FOSTER EMPLOYMENT LAW.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ROBERT NORTH FOR COMPLEX FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 180523-0592 $1,000.00; 180523-0592-CK Reference Number 653 652

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO BLANCA SANCHEZ SERVED ON 11/21/17 WITH FEES OF $85.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SUPERIOR HAULING AND FAST TRANSIT, INC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/20/17 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON NICHOLAS FLORES; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/20/17 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PLAINTIFF ROBERT NORTH FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0112 $435.00; 171030-0112-CK Reference Number 4217

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less