This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/23/2018 at 22:32:18 (UTC).

NONA RAE GOW -N- ROBERT RONALD GOW

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 NONA RAE GOW -N- ROBERT RONALD GOW was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Victorville District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1302

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Victorville District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NONA RAE GOW

Claimants

OPERATING ENGINEERS PENSION TRUST

GENERAL ATOMICS: PENSION PLAN OF GEN ATOMIC

Respondent

ROBERT RONALD GOW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Claimant Attorney

LAQUER, URBAN, CLIFFORD & HODGE

225 S. Lake Ave. Suite 200

Pasadena, CA 91101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2013
  • COPY OF 12/19 ORDER MAILED TO LAW OFFICES OF RICHARD R MUIR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • ORDER OF TECHNICAL CORRECTION OF QDRO RE: OPERATING ENGINEERS PENSION TRUST SIGNED & FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • COPIES OF THE (3) QDRO ORDERS MAILED TO LAW OFFICE OF RICHARD R MUIR IN SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2013
  • QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER FILED BY RICHARD R MUIR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2013
  • QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER FILED BY RICHARD R MUIR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER FILED BY RICHARD R MUIR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2013
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 130925-0097 $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF OAHG X2 BY MAIL ON 05/07/13 AS TO ROBERT R GOW, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FILED. DONALD M MEDEIROS WITHDRAWS AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD. NONA RAE GOW IS NOW REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDR/NTC TO WITHHOLD BY MAIL ON 12/18/12 AS TO OPERATING ENGINEERS PENSION FUND, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
76 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON ROBERT RONALD GOW; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 05/04/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2011
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY NONA RAE GOW FOR PRELIMINARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY NONA RAE GOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • SEPARATE PROPERTY DECLARATION FILED BY NONA RAE GOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • COMMUNITY AND QUASI COMMUNITY PROPERTY DECLARATION OF NONA RAE GOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • FILING FEE PAID BY NONA RAE GOW FOR FIRST APP FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 110504-4252 $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • OSC RE: AF/SS/OTHER:DIVISION OF PENSION (050411) FILED BY NONA RAE GOW.; Minutes; Receipt: 110504-4227 $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT V12

    Read MoreRead Less