This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/30/2018 at 10:16:35 (UTC).

NOBLE ELECTRIC INC VS WALDEN STRUCTURES INC

Case Summary

On 03/03/2014 NOBLE ELECTRIC INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WALDEN STRUCTURES INC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1130

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NOBLE ELECTRIC INC

Defendant

WALDEN STRUCTURES INC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2014
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (RESET); Disposition: REQ FOR DSMSL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); Minutes; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; DAN DETIENNE, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: NOBLE ELECTRIC INC, WALDEN STRUCTURES INC; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NO APPEARANCES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (RESET); Disposition: Continued; Minutes; STEVEN A MAPES, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: MARCIA HOUSTON; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF NOBLE ELECTRIC INC PRESENT; DEFENDANT WALDEN STRUCTURES INC PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PARTIES.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 06/30/14 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT F2.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SMALL CLAIMS SUBPOENA BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 05/05/14 AS TO ANTHONY ROMERO, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO WALDEN STRUCTURES INC; PARTY SERVED ON 04/14/14 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • PARTY WALDEN STRUCTURES INC UPDATED: ADDING AGNET FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • AMENDMENT TO ADDING AN AGENT FOR SERVICE FILED BY NOBLE ELECTRIC INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • SMALL CLAIMS SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO EACH DEFENDANT.; Minutes; Receipt: 140410-0706 $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • FILING FEE PAID BY NOBLE ELECTRIC INC FOR COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 140410-0716 $2.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SMALL CLAIMS SUBPOENA BY PLAINTIFF ON 04/09/14 AS TO ANTHONY ROMERO, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF NOBLE ELECTRIC INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 140303-0479 $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F2

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NOBLE ELECTRIC is a litigant

Latest cases where WALDEN STRUCTURES INC. is a litigant