This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 11:47:01 (UTC).

NIKON-V-CARNIELLO

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 NIKON-V-CARNIELLO was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0969

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAM P NIKON

Defendant

TRENT CARNIELLO

 

Court Documents

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (RESET); Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (RESET); Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:31; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: D FERRIS; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF WILLIAM P NIKON PRESENT; DEFENDANT TRENT CARNIELLO PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; AFTER MEDIATION, MATTER IS NOT SETTLED.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; WITNESS -- WILLIAM P NIKON IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; WITNESS -- TRENT CARNIELLO IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 02/01/2016 OF WILLIAM NIKON ORDERED ENTERED 05/06/16; JUDGMENT FOR: WILLIAM P NIKON; JUDGMENT AGAINST: TRENT CARNIELLO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $838.03 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $85.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $923.03; 10:49; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLA CLAIM FILED AS TO TRENT CARNIELLO. PARTY SERVED ON 03/28/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $55.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLA CLAIM FILED AS TO TRENT CARNIELLO. PARTY SERVED ON 03/28/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $55.00. (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 160201-0859 $30.00; 160201-0859-EZ Reference Number 8BA87206J247905

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2017
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AS TO PLAINTIFF RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 05/12/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (RESET); Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:31; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: D FERRIS; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF WILLIAM P NIKON PRESENT; DEFENDANT TRENT CARNIELLO PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; AFTER MEDIATION, MATTER IS NOT SETTLED.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; WITNESS -- WILLIAM P NIKON IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; WITNESS -- TRENT CARNIELLO IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 02/01/2016 OF WILLIAM NIKON ORDERED ENTERED 05/06/16; JUDGMENT FOR: WILLIAM P NIKON; JUDGMENT AGAINST: TRENT CARNIELLO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $838.03 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $85.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $923.03; 10:49; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLA CLAIM FILED AS TO TRENT CARNIELLO. PARTY SERVED ON 03/28/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $55.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • REQUEST TO POSTPONE IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): SC-150 FORM IS NOT USED TO POSTPONE A CASE IF DEFENDANT HAS NOT BEEN SERVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • REQ TO POSTPONE RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • E PAYMENT TRANSACTION NUMBER 8BA87206J2479051B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 160201-0859 $30.00; 160201-0859-EZ Reference Number 8BA87206J247905

    Read MoreRead Less