This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 06:13:28 (UTC).

NIJJAR -V- KOLB

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 NIJJAR -V- KOLB was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4718

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PETE NIJJAR

Defendants

KRISTY K. KOLB

KALEY L. KOLB

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM M GARRETT,JR

463 N. Sierra Way

San Bernardino, CA 92410

 

Court Documents

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF PETE NIJJAR ORDERED ENTERED 08/22/17; JUDGMENT FOR: PETE NIJJAR; JUDGMENT AGAINST: KALEY L. KOLB, KRISTY K. KOLB, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: KALEY L. KOLB, KRISTY K. KOLB, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO KRISTY K. KOLB SERVED ON 07/25/17 WITH COSTS OF $20.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO KRISTY K. KOLB SERVED ON 07/25/17 WITH COSTS OF $20.00 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO KALEY L. KOLB SERVED ON 07/25/17 WITH COSTS OF $20.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO KALEY L. KOLB SERVED ON 07/25/17 WITH COSTS OF $20.00 FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON KALEY L. KOLB.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON KALEY L. KOLB.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON KALEY L. KOLB.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON KALEY L. KOLB.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO KALEY L. KOLB SERVED ON 07/25/17 WITH COSTS OF $20.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO KALEY L. KOLB SERVED ON 07/25/17 WITH COSTS OF $20.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO KRISTY K. KOLB SERVED ON 07/25/17 WITH COSTS OF $20.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO KRISTY K. KOLB SERVED ON 07/25/17 WITH COSTS OF $20.00 FILED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF PETE NIJJAR ORDERED ENTERED 08/22/17; JUDGMENT FOR: PETE NIJJAR; JUDGMENT AGAINST: KALEY L. KOLB, KRISTY K. KOLB, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: KALEY L. KOLB, KRISTY K. KOLB, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( FORWARDED TO SHERIFF)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( FORWARDED TO SHERIFF)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( FORWARDED TO SHERIFF)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( FORWARDED TO SHERIFF)

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2017
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 170824-0573 $25.00; 170824-0573-CK Reference Number 59325

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( FORWARDED TO SHERIFF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF PETE NIJJAR ORDERED ENTERED 08/22/17; JUDGMENT FOR: PETE NIJJAR; JUDGMENT AGAINST: KALEY L. KOLB, KRISTY K. KOLB, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: KALEY L. KOLB, KRISTY K. KOLB, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON KALEY L. KOLB.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF PETE NIJJAR AS TO KALEY L. KOLB.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/25/17 WITH FEES OF $20.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF PETE NIJJAR, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO KRISTY K. KOLB SERVED ON 07/25/17 WITH COSTS OF $20.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO POST SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170718-0696 $20.00; 170718-0696-CK Reference Number 59091

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $5,825.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $87.50.--BEGINNING ON 07/14/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170718-0441 $255.00; 170718-0441-CK Reference Number 59143

    Read MoreRead Less