This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 08:22:41 (UTC).

NICOLE DE ROSSI -V- ISABEL BARBEE

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 NICOLE DE ROSSI -V- ISABEL BARBEE was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3070

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NICOLE DEROSSI

Defendants

GREGORY BARBEE

ISABEL BARBEE

AMELIA BARBEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF SCOTT A MEYERS

2600 W Olive Ave 5Th Floor

Burbank, CA 91505

Defendant Attorney

HARTSUYKER, STRATMAN & WILLIAMS-ABREGO

Pob 258829

Oklahoma City, OK 731258829

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2019
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON 06/11/18 TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SERVICE COMPLETION/TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; WILFRED J SCHNEIDER JR., JUDGE; CLERK: ALMA HERNANDEZ; COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON 11800; COURT ATTENDANT R BRUCATO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY SCOTT A. MEYERS APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR NICOLE DEROSSI.; ATTORNEY MARIALLE A. BELL PRESENT FOR GREGORY AND AMELIA BARBEE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COUNSEL REPRESENTS ANSWER WAS FILED ON 3/28/18 FOR BOTH GREGORY AND AMELIA BARBEE.; ESTIMATED LENGTH OF TRIAL 5 DAY(S).; JURY DEMANDED BY PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT.; JURY FEES ARE TO BE POSTED AT LEAST 10 DAYS PRIOR TO TRIAL DATE. FAILURE TO POST JURY FEES WILL BE; DEEMED A WAIVER OF JURY TRIAL.; TRIAL SETTING ORDERS ISSUED.; HEARINGS:; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 04/18/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S32; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 04/22/19 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S32 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 5 DAYS.; "REQUIREMENTS OF TRIAL" HANDED TO ALL PARTIES; COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DEFENDANT GREGORY BARBEE, AMELIA BARBEE FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GREGORY BARBEE, AMELIA BARBEE FOR FIRST PAPER FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 180328-0690 $870.00; 180328-0690-CK Reference Number 928010911

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 07/11/2017 OF NICOLE DEROSSI, AMELIA BARBEE REMOVED AS A PARTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • ANSWER FILED BY AMELIA BARBEE; PARTY REPRESENTED BY HARTSUYKER, STRATMAN & WILLIAMS-ABREGO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 07/11/2017 OF NICOLE DEROSSI, AMELIA BARBEE IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • ANSWER FILED BY GREGORY BARBEE; PARTY REPRESENTED BY HARTSUYKER, STRATMAN & WILLIAMS-ABREGO.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS RE: PTLF FTA/TRIAL SETTING CONFRC; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; GILBERT OCHOA, JUDGE; CLERK: KIM ALLAIN; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT N PINGREY; APPEARANCES:; SCOTT MEYERS APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR NICOLE DEROSSI.; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF.; REASON: TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : SERVICE COMPLETION/TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET FOR 06/11/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S32.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT NAMING DOES 1 TO BE AMELIA BARBEE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 07/11/2017 OF NICOLE DEROSSI, AMELIA BARBEE IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; WILFRED J SCHNEIDER JR., JUDGE; CLERK: KIM ALLAIN; COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON 11800; COURT ATTENDANT R BRUCATO; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PLAINTIFF COUNSEL HAS FAILED TO APPEAR AND DEFENDANTS REMAIN UNSERVED; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : SANCTIONS RE: PTLF FTA/TRIAL SETTING CONFRC SET FOR 02/09/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S32.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0039 $435.00; 170711-0039-CK Reference Number 7714

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less