This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/13/2018 at 19:31:33 (UTC).

NICOLAS CORONADO - MARIA LOURDES VAZQUEZ

Case Summary

On 03/07/2017 NICOLAS CORONADO - MARIA LOURDES VAZQUEZ was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1865

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NICOLAS CORONADO

Respondent

MARIA LOURDES VAZQUEZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON NICOLAS CORONADO FOR CERT COPY IN THE AMOUNT OF $16.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • VACATE STFL HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 05/08/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT SCC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT -- DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 09/08/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • NOTICE/JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 03/07/2017 OF NICOLAS CORONADO FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 03/07/2017 OF NICOLAS CORONADO ORDERED ENTERED 04/19/17; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED ON MARIA LOURDES VAZQUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY NICOLAS CORONADO FOR PRELIMINARY WAIVE FINAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST MARIA LOURDES VAZQUEZ FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 03/07/2017 OF NICOLAS CORONADO AS TO MARIA LOURDES VAZQUEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MARIA LOURDES VAZQUEZ; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/07/17 WITH COSTS OF $50.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY NICOLAS CORONADO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY NICOLAS CORONADO IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON NICOLAS CORONADO FOR COURT FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S50

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.