This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/13/2018 at 15:00:29 (UTC).

NICHOLE MYLES N SANDEY WAIGHT

Case Summary

On 01/31/2017 NICHOLE MYLES N SANDEY WAIGHT was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0841

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NICHOLE MYLES

Respondent

SANDEY WAIGHT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2017
  • VACATE STFL HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/03/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT SCC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT -- DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 08/06/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 04/20/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • JUDGMENT SIGNED TRACKED TO PROCESSING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 01/31/2017 OF NICHOLE MYLES FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 01/31/2017 OF NICHOLE MYLES ORDERED ENTERED 04/13/17; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY NICHOLE MYLES FOR FINAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY NICHOLE MYLES FOR PRELIMINARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • COMMUNITY AND QUASI COMMUNITY PROPERTY DECLARATION OF NICHOLE MYLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • SEPARATE PROPERTY DECLARATION FILED BY NICHOLE MYLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF JUDGMENT SENT.; Minutes; JUDGMENT WAS RETURNED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS: PLEASE DO NOT PUT WHITEOUT ON FORMS. COURT WILL; NOT ACCEPT. ALSO, PLEASE FILL OUT THE FL-160 AND MARK EITHER COMMUNTIY OR SEPARATE AND FILL IN THE; FIELDS. ALSO, MISSING DOCUMENT FL-141. PLEASE RESUBMIT WITH FL-141 AND CORRECTED FL-160 AND; JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SANDEY WAIGHT; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 02/05/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S51

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY NICHOLE MYLES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY NICHOLE MYLES IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON NICHOLE MYLES FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.