This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 08:12:45 (UTC).

NGUYEN -V- YINGST

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 NGUYEN -V- YINGST was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9438

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAN NGUYEN

Defendant

JASON KARL YINGST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANSON & HANSON

7344 Magnolia Avenue Suite 235

Riverside, CA 92504

Defendant Attorney

HORTON OBERRECHT KIRKPATRICK &MARTHA

225 Broadway Suite 2200

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF JURY FEES BY MAIL ON 03/19/18 AS TO HANSON &HANSON, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF JURY FEES BY MAIL ON 03/19/18 AS TO HANSON &HANSON, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER BY MAIL ON 12/05/17 AS TO HANSON & HANSON, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER BY MAIL ON 12/05/17 AS TO HANSON & HANSON, FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JASON KARL YINGST SERVED ON 11/12/17 WITH FEES OF $30.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JASON KARL YINGST SERVED ON 11/12/17 WITH FEES OF $30.00.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY JASON KARL YINGST

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY JASON KARL YINGST

NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT FILED BY JASON KARL YINGST.

NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT FILED BY JASON KARL YINGST.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

ANSWER FILED BY JASON KARL YINGST; PARTY REPRESENTED BY HORTON OBERRECHT KIRKPATRICK &MARTHA.

ANSWER FILED BY JASON KARL YINGST; PARTY REPRESENTED BY HORTON OBERRECHT KIRKPATRICK &MARTHA.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2019
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR TAN NGUYEN.; Minutes; Receipt: 180822-0536 $150.00; 180822-0536-CK Reference Number 102682

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DEMAND FOR JURY AND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES PURSUANT TO CCP 631 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL A SACHS, JUDGE; CLERK: KIMBERLY HOTCHKISS; COURT REPORTER D'ANNE GOATCHER 11726; COURT ATTENDANT T MANZO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JEREMY K. HANSON PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; MICHAEL D. MARCHESINI APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR JASON KARL YINGST.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; JURY DEMANDED BY DEFENSE.; ESTIMATED LENGTH OF TRIAL 5-7 DAY(S).; "REQUIREMENTS OF TRIAL" HANDED TO ALL PARTIES; HEARINGS:; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 04/04/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S28; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 04/08/19 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S28 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 5-7 DAYS.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; AND PROVIDE REQUIREMENTS OF TRIAL.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JASON KARL YINGST FOR FAX FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 180326-0411 $6.00; 180326-0411-VS Reference Number 033-0060110408

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF JURY FEES BY MAIL ON 03/19/18 AS TO HANSON &HANSON, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR JASON KARL YINGST.; Minutes; Receipt: 180326-0407 $150.00; 180326-0407-VS Reference Number 033-0060110408

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY JASON KARL YINGST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT FILED BY JASON KARL YINGST.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JASON KARL YINGST FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171208-0343 $435.00; 171208-0343-CK Reference Number CK#16841

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JASON KARL YINGST SERVED ON 11/12/17 WITH FEES OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PLAINTIFF TAN NGUYEN FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY TAN NGUYEN FOR 1ST APP FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0405 $435.00; 171004-0405-CK Reference Number CK 101144

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less