This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 02/17/2020 at 13:00:07 (UTC).

NEWPORTER APARTMENTS -V- JUAN MANUEL HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 12/18/2019 NEWPORTER APARTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JUAN MANUEL HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2563

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEWPORTER APARTMENTS LLC

Defendant

JUAN MANUEL HERNANDEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DABE, FELMAN, DAGG ENHURST & EL

13743 Ventura Boulevard Suite 350

Sherman Oaks, CA 91423

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER-UNLAWFUL DETAINER BY MAIL ON 02/04/20 AS TO RICHARD DAGGENHURST, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER-UNLAWFUL DETAINER BY MAIL ON 02/04/20 AS TO RICHARD DAGGENHURST, FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY JUAN MANUEL HERNANDEZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY JUAN MANUEL HERNANDEZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

MOTION RE: DEMURRER - FILED BY DEFENDANT JUAN MANUEL HERNANDEZ; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

MOTION RE: DEMURRER - FILED BY DEFENDANT JUAN MANUEL HERNANDEZ; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; ; Minutes; ; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; ; ; 08:47; ; ; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; ; ; CLERK: AMANDA O'BRIEN; ; ; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; ; ; ; ; APPEARANCES:; ; ; DEFENDANT JUAN MANUEL HERNANDEZ PRESENT; ; ; CERTIFIED INTERPRETER MILTON SAUCEDO #301753 IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET SPANISH/ENGLISH FOR DEFENDANT. INTERPRETER'S JUDICIAL COUNCIL BADGE NUMBER HAS BEEN VALIDATED AND IDENTIFICATION HAS BEEN VERIFIED.; ; ; INTERPRETER OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND PLACED ON FILE WITH THE COURT.; ; ; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: NEWPORTER APARTMENTS LLC; ; ; ; ; PROCEEDINGS:; ; ; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ; ; PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM.; ; ; COURT GIVES TENTATIVE RULING; ; ; DEMURRER IS OVERRULED AS TO JUAN MANUEL HERNANDEZ; ; ; 5 DAYS TO ANSWER.; ; ; NOTICE WAIVED.; ; ; ACTION - COMPLETE; ; ; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ; ; ;

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEMURRER BY MAIL ON 01/09/20 AS TO NEWPORTER APARTMENTS LLC, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEMURRER BY MAIL ON 01/09/20 AS TO NEWPORTER APARTMENTS LLC, FILED.

DEMURRER FILED BY JUAN MANUEL HERNANDEZ; REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER(IMAGED)

DEMURRER FILED BY JUAN MANUEL HERNANDEZ; REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER(IMAGED)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JUAN MANUEL HERNANDEZ; PARTY SERVED ON 12/26/19 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JUAN MANUEL HERNANDEZ; PARTY SERVED ON 12/26/19 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; ; Minutes; Receipt: 191218-0837 $255.00 ; 191218-0837-CK Reference Number 312972

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketSTATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketSTATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketVACATE SCUD HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 02/18/20 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT B3X.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER-UNLAWFUL DETAINER BY MAIL ON 02/04/20 AS TO RICHARD DAGGENHURST, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER FILED BY JUAN MANUEL HERNANDEZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION RE: DEMURRER - FILED BY DEFENDANT JUAN MANUEL HERNANDEZ; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; ; Minutes; ; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; ; ; 08:47; ; ; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; ; ; CLERK: AMANDA O'BRIEN; ; ; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; ; ; ; ; APPEARANCES:; ; ; DEFENDANT JUAN MANUEL HERNANDEZ PRESENT; ; ; CERTIFIED INTERPRETER MILTON SAUCEDO #301753 IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET SPANISH/ENGLISH FOR DEFENDANT. INTERPRETER'S JUDICIAL COUNCIL BADGE NUMBER HAS BEEN VALIDATED AND IDENTIFICATION HAS BEEN VERIFIED.; ; ; INTERPRETER OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND PLACED ON FILE WITH THE COURT.; ; ; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: NEWPORTER APARTMENTS LLC; ; ; ; ; PROCEEDINGS:; ; ; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ; ; PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM.; ; ; COURT GIVES TENTATIVE RULING; ; ; DEMURRER IS OVERRULED AS TO JUAN MANUEL HERNANDEZ; ; ; 5 DAYS TO ANSWER.; ; ; NOTICE WAIVED.; ; ; ACTION - COMPLETE; ; ; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ; ; ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEFAULT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): DEMURRER FILED -.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR JUDGMENT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): MANDATORY FORM CIV100 WAS UPDATED ON 01/01/20 FORM RECEIVED IS OUTDATED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JUAN MANUEL HERNANDEZ; PARTY SERVED ON 12/26/19 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketDECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $41.66.--BEGINNING ON 11/30/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER 60 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketPAST DUE RENT IS $1,250.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; ; Minutes; Receipt: 191218-0837 $255.00 ; 191218-0837-CK Reference Number 312972

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEWPORTER APARTMENTS LLC is a litigant