This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/14/2021 at 10:43:38 (UTC).

NEWPORTER APARTMENTS-V-HARRIS

Case Summary

On 10/08/2019 NEWPORTER APARTMENTS-V-HARRIS was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2095

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEWPORTER APARTMENTS LLC

Defendants

LENCEE NICHOLE HARRIS

HARRIS, LENCEE NICHOLE

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DABE, FELMAN, DAGG ENHURST & EL

13743 Ventura Boulevard Suite 350

Sherman Oaks, CA 91423

Felman, Edward Luis

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $85.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $85.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $85.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $85.00.

AMENDED RETURN TO WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED.

12/13/2019: AMENDED RETURN TO WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM

12/05/2019: LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM

12/05/2019: LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNT

11/06/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNT

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP

11/06/2019: APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED. JUDGMENT

10/30/2019: CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED. JUDGMENT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK

10/30/2019: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMIS

10/30/2019: APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMIS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON LENC

10/30/2019: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON LENC

NOTICE IMAGED

10/08/2019: NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

10/08/2019: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT -$10,000 FILED. SUMMON

10/08/2019: UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT -$10,000 FILED. SUMMON

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2020
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer - Case Open

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Filed; Comment: AMENDED RETURN TO WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLevying Officer Ntc of Writ of Possession Filed. Costs of:; Comment: LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $85.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20191106-0259; ConversionPayment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketComment:; Comment: DOCUMENTS SENT IN SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - San Bernardino; Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY. ON 000100 AS TO LENCEE NICHOLE HARRIS (POSSESSION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession Filed; Comment: APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff Prevails; Comment: PLAINTIFF PREVAILS

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketReturn Mail; Comment: RETURN MAIL: NTC TO DEFENDANT OF FILING RECEIVED BACK FROM POST OFFICE/LENCEE NICHOLE HARRIS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20191008-0859; ConversionPayment; $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $280.00; Total Payments and Credits: $280.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketDeclaration of Daily Rental Value Filed-Daily Rental Value; Comment: DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $31.83.--BEGINNING ON 10/01/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketPast Due Rent is:; Comment: PAST DUE RENT IS $955.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Complaint of <$10,000 Filed; Comment: UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. 191008-0859-CK CUE/ 255.00 PAYMT 191008-0859-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 312707

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases where NEWPORTER APARTMENTS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FELMAN EDWARD LUIS