This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2021 at 03:03:47 (UTC).

NEWPORTER APARTMENTS -V- FABIAN SANCHEZ

Case Summary

On 09/20/2019 NEWPORTER APARTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against FABIAN SANCHEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1989

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEWPORTER APARTMENTS LLC

Defendants

FABIAN SANCHEZ

MIRELLA MARTINEZ

SANCHEZ, FABIAN

MARTINEZ, MIRELLA

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FELMAN, DAGGENHURST & EL DABE

13743 Ventura Blvd. Suite 350

Sherman Oaks, CA 91423

Felman, Daggenhurs & El Dabe

Attorney at Felman, Daggenhurs & El Dabe

 

Court Documents

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM

11/22/2019: LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP

10/23/2019: APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED. JUDGMENT

10/18/2019: CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED. JUDGMENT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MIRE

10/18/2019: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MIRE

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

10/10/2019: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON FABI

10/08/2019: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON FABI

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

09/20/2019: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2020
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer - Case Open

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLevying Officer Ntc of Writ of Possession Filed. Costs of:; Comment: LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20191023-0275; ConversionPayment; $25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession Filed; Comment: APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff Prevails; Comment: PLAINTIFF PREVAILS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketWrit Fee Paid; Comment: WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID 191023-0275-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 191023-0275-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 312777

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - San Bernardino; Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY. ON 000100 AS TO FABIAN SANCHEZ, MIRELLA MARTINEZ (POSSESSION)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment (Possession Only) LLT; Comment; Comment: (9/20/2019 - 0001 - UDLUD Complaint <$10,000); Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To: NEWPORTER APARTMENTS LLC; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: Address in Court File; Awarded Against; SANCHEZ, FABIAN; MARTINEZ, MIRELLA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketDefault Packet Received; Comment: DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20190920-0774; ConversionPayment; $255.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $255.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $280.00; Total Payments and Credits: $280.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketDeclaration of Daily Rental Value Filed-Daily Rental Value; Comment: DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $40.16.--BEGINNING ON 10/01/19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketPast Due Rent is:; Comment: PAST DUE RENT IS $1,205.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Complaint of <$10,000 Filed; Comment: UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. 190920-0774-CK CUE/ 255.00 PAYMT 190920-0774-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 312681

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases where NEWPORTER APARTMENTS LLC is a litigant