This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/16/2021 at 20:56:13 (UTC).

NEWPORTER APARTMENTS-V-BARBER

Case Summary

On 12/24/2019 NEWPORTER APARTMENTS-V-BARBER was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2599

  • Filing Date:

    12/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEWPORTER APARTMENTS LLC

Defendants

LATASHA L BARBER

BARBER, LATASHA L

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FELMAN, DAGGENHURST & EL DABE

13743 Ventura Blvd. Suite 350

Sherman Oaks, CA 91423

Felman, Daggenhurs & El Dabe

Attorney at Felman, Daggenhurs & El Dabe

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM

02/14/2020: LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNT

01/17/2020: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNT

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED. JUDGMENT

01/08/2020: CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED. JUDGMENT

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMIS

01/08/2020: APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMIS

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK

01/08/2020: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON LATA

01/08/2020: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON LATA

NOTICE IMAGED

12/24/2019: NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

12/24/2019: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT -$10,000 FILED. SUMMON

12/24/2019: UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT -$10,000 FILED. SUMMON

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLevying Officer Ntc of Writ of Possession Filed. Costs of:; Comment: LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20200117-0484; ConversionPayment; $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketWrit Fee Paid; Comment: WRIT FEE OF $40.00 PAID 200117-0484-CK MJX/ 40.00 PAYMT 200117-0484-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 313197

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - San Bernardino; Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY. ON 000100 AS TO LATASHA L BARBER (POSSESSION)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment (Possession Only) LLT; Comment; Comment: (12/24/2019 - 0001 - UDLUD Complaint <$10,000); Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To: NEWPORTER APARTMENTS LLC; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: Address in Court File; Awarded Against: BARBER, LATASHA L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff Prevails

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketDefault Packet Received; Comment: DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession Filed; Comment: APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service of Summons & Cmplt filed; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON LATASHA L BARBER; PARTY SERVED ON 12/27/19 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20191224-0516; ConversionPayment; $255.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $255.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $295.00; Total Payments and Credits: $295.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketDeclaration of Daily Rental Value Filed-Daily Rental Value; Comment: DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $33.33.--BEGINNING ON 01/01/20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketPast Due Rent is:; Comment: PAST DUE RENT IS $1,000.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Complaint of <$10,000 Filed; Comment: UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. 191224-0516-CK CUE/ 255.00 PAYMT 191224-0516-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 313130

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases where NEWPORTER APARTMENTS LLC is a litigant