Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 06:56:02 (UTC).

NEWPORTER APARTMENTS LLC-v-DE JESUS

Case Summary

On 07/27/2017 NEWPORTER APARTMENTS LLC-v-DE JESUS was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1780

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEWPORTER APARTMENTS LLC

Defendants

ORLANDO DE JESUS

BRENDA DE JESUS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DABE, FELMAN, DAGG ENHURST & EL

13743 Ventura Boulevard Suite 350

Sherman Oaks, CA 91423

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/27/2017 OF NEWPORTER APARTMENTS LLC ORDERED ENTERED 08/09/17; JUDGMENT FOR: NEWPORTER APARTMENTS LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: BRENDA DE JESUS, ORLANDO DE JESUS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: BRENDA DE JESUS, ORLANDO DE JESUS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON ORLANDO DE JESUS; PARTY SERVED ON 08/01/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON ORLANDO DE JESUS; PARTY SERVED ON 08/01/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON BRENDA DE JESUS, ORLANDO DE JESUS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON BRENDA DE JESUS, ORLANDO DE JESUS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON BRENDA DE JESUS; PARTY SERVED ON 08/01/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON BRENDA DE JESUS; PARTY SERVED ON 08/01/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170727-0713 $255.00; 170727-0713-CK Reference Number 288752

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170727-0713 $255.00; 170727-0713-CK Reference Number 288752

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • WRIT MAILED TO ATTY IN SASE THIS DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 170810-0259 $25.00; 170810-0259-CK Reference Number 289145

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • VACATE SCUD HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/19/17 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT B3X.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/27/2017 OF NEWPORTER APARTMENTS LLC ORDERED ENTERED 08/09/17; JUDGMENT FOR: NEWPORTER APARTMENTS LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: BRENDA DE JESUS, ORLANDO DE JESUS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: BRENDA DE JESUS, ORLANDO DE JESUS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON ORLANDO DE JESUS; PARTY SERVED ON 08/01/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON BRENDA DE JESUS, ORLANDO DE JESUS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/27/2017 OF NEWPORTER APARTMENTS LLC AS TO BRENDA DE JESUS, ORLANDO DE JESUS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON BRENDA DE JESUS; PARTY SERVED ON 08/01/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $30.00.--BEGINNING ON 07/31/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $1,800.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170727-0713 $255.00; 170727-0713-CK Reference Number 288752

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEWPORTER APARTMENTS LLC is a litigant