This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/14/2016 at 10:00:56 (UTC).

NEWPORT CAPITAL RECOVERY GROUP -V- DONNY FERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 NEWPORT CAPITAL RECOVERY GROUP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DONNY FERNANDEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4524

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEWPORT CAPITAL RECOVERY GROUPLLC

Defendant

DONNY FERNANDEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENOSIAN & MIELE

8581 Santa Monica Blvd #17

Los Angeles, CA 90069

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2012
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2011
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2011
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( WRIT ISSUED TO SASE 9/9/11 ); Minutes; Receipt: 110909-1497$25.00; 110909-1497-CK Reference Number 84449

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2011
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 110908-2158$25.00; 110908-2158-CK Reference Number 82883

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2011
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/04/2011 OF NEWPORT CAPITAL RECOVERY GROUPLLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/04/2011 OF NEWPORT CAPITAL RECOVERY GROUPLLC ORDERED ENTERED 08/08/11; JUDGMENT FOR: NEWPORT CAPITAL RECOVERY GROUPLLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: DONNY FERNANDEZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,618.45 INTEREST $447.40 ATTORNEY FEES $311.00 COSTS $435.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,811.85; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2011
  • DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST AND ATTY FEES AND COST FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2011
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/04/2011 OF NEWPORT CAPITAL RECOVERY GROUPLLC AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2011
  • DECLARATION OF 1033 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2011
  • DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE AS TO DONNY FERNANDEZ FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2011
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2011
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST DONNY FERNANDEZ FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2011
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/04/2011 OF NEWPORT CAPITAL RECOVERY GROUPLLC AS TO DONNY FERNANDEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2011
  • AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR DONNY FERNANDEZ BY PLAINTIFF FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2011
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO DONNY FERNANDEZ SERVED ON 05/31/11 WITH FEES OF $65.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2011
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/26/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R9.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE AND PARTY INFORMATION ADDED; Minutes; Receipt: 110504-2051$240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less