This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 05:34:08 (UTC).

NEVAREZ -V- RIALTO UNIFIED

Case Summary

On 12/19/2016 NEVAREZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against RIALTO UNIFIED. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1534

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GENEVIEVE NEVAREZ

Defendant

RIALTO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOTTILE BALTAXE

4360 Park Terrace Drive Ste 140

Westlake Village, CA 91361

Defendant Attorney

MCCUNE & HARBER LLP

515 S. Figueroa Street Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

MOTION IN LIMINE RE: DEFENDANTS #1 FILED.

MOTION IN LIMINE RE: DEFENDANTS #1 FILED.

DECLARATION OF ROBERT ROMERO ISO EX PARTE FILED

DECLARATION OF ROBERT ROMERO ISO EX PARTE FILED

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL BALTAXE ISO EX PARTE FILED

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL BALTAXE ISO EX PARTE FILED

DECLARATION OF PAYAM AFRAMIAN ISO EX PARTE FILED

DECLARATION OF PAYAM AFRAMIAN ISO EX PARTE FILED

EX-PARTE MOTION RE: APPLICATION TO CONT. TRIAL & SHORTEN TIME TO BE HEARD ON 08/01/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30X.

EX-PARTE MOTION RE: APPLICATION TO CONT. TRIAL & SHORTEN TIME TO BE HEARD ON 08/01/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30X.

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS SET FOR HEARING ON 05/15/18 FILED BY RIALTO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT. (IMAGED)

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS SET FOR HEARING ON 05/15/18 FILED BY RIALTO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT. (IMAGED)

DECLARATION OF PAYAM AFRAMIAN ISO OPPOSITION FILED

DECLARATION OF PAYAM AFRAMIAN ISO OPPOSITION FILED

REPLY TO ISO TO MOTION RE: COMPEL SET FOR HEARING ON 02/20/18 FILED BY RIALTO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT. (IMAGED)

REPLY TO ISO TO MOTION RE: COMPEL SET FOR HEARING ON 02/20/18 FILED BY RIALTO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT. (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: TO COMPEL DEPO OF PLAINITFF SET FOR HEARING ON 02/20/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF GENEVIEVE NEVAREZ (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: TO COMPEL DEPO OF PLAINITFF SET FOR HEARING ON 02/20/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF GENEVIEVE NEVAREZ (IMAGED)

DECLARATION OF PAYAM AFRAMIAN ISO OPPOSITION FILED

DECLARATION OF PAYAM AFRAMIAN ISO OPPOSITION FILED

NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO COMPEL OFF CALENDAR FILED BY RIALTO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT.

NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO COMPEL OFF CALENDAR FILED BY RIALTO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT.

MOTION RE: COMPEL DEPOSITION SET FOR HEARING ON 02/20/18, FILED BY DEFENDANT RIALTO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: COMPEL DEPOSITION SET FOR HEARING ON 02/20/18, FILED BY DEFENDANT RIALTO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: COMPEL RESPONSES REQ FOR PROD OF DOCS SET FOR HEARING ON 02/20/18, FILED BY DEFENDANT RIALTO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: COMPEL RESPONSES REQ FOR PROD OF DOCS SET FOR HEARING ON 02/20/18, FILED BY DEFENDANT RIALTO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY RIALTO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY RIALTO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT.

ANSWER FILED BY RIALTO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT; PARTY REPRESENTED BY MCCUNE & HARBER LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY RIALTO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT; PARTY REPRESENTED BY MCCUNE & HARBER LLP.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO RIALTO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT SERVED ON 12/27/16 WITH FEES OF $120.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO RIALTO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT SERVED ON 12/27/16 WITH FEES OF $120.00.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2018
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION IN LIMINE RE: DEFENDANTS #3 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION IN LIMINE RE: DEFENDANTS #1 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION IN LIMINE RE: DEFENDANTS #2 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE: TO CONTINUE TRIAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD; COURT REPORTER DEENA MACIAS 9826; COURT ATTENDANT S CARR; APPEARANCES:; PAYAMI AFRAMIAN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR GENEVIEVE NEVAREZ.; ATTORNEY NOT PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; EX-PARTE HEARING IS HELD.; PURSUANT TO STIPULATION OF COUNSEL:; EX PARTE ORDERS TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATES IS GRANTED; HEARINGS:; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 09/20/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 09/24/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S30 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 0.00 DAYS.; ASSIGNED TRIAL DATES SHALL BE BINDING ON TRIAL COUNSEL.; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF ROBERT ROMERO ISO EX PARTE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY SOTTILE ISO EX PARTE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE UNDER CCP 170.6 AS TO MICHAEL A SACHS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY GENEVIEVE NEVAREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • PLAINTIFF GENEVIEVE NEVAREZ FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GENEVIEVE NEVAREZ FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 161219-0839 $435.00; 161219-0839-CK Reference Number CK#106640

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less