This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/09/2018 at 08:57:11 (UTC).

NEEB -V- CARTER

Case Summary

On 01/09/2017 NEEB filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CARTER. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0007

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BILL NEEB

Defendant

FORREST CARTER

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING SENT.

NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING SENT.; Minutes; ON COURTS OWN MOTION, YOUR HEARING CURRENTLY SCHEDULED FOR 02/17/17 AT 1:00PM IN DEPT M4 HAS; BEEN RESCHEDULED FOR 02/24/17 AT 1:00 PM IN DEPT M4.; NOTICES PRINTED

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 01:00 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 01:00 HOURS.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO FORREST CARTER SERVED ON 01/12/17 WITH COSTS OF $40.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO FORREST CARTER SERVED ON 01/12/17 WITH COSTS OF $40.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 01/13/17 WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 01/13/17 WITH FEES OF $40.00.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY FORREST CARTER; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY FORREST CARTER; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170109-0608 $255.00; 170109-0608-CK Reference Number 1475

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:20 HRS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 01:00 HRS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • VACATE CTS HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 02/17/17 AT 01:00 IN DEPARTMENT M4.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING SENT.; Minutes; ON COURTS OWN MOTION, YOUR HEARING CURRENTLY SCHEDULED FOR 02/17/17 AT 1:00PM IN DEPT M4 HAS; BEEN RESCHEDULED FOR 02/24/17 AT 1:00 PM IN DEPT M4.; NOTICES PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 01:00 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 01/09/2017 OF BILL NEEB AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY FORREST CARTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY FORREST CARTER IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON FORREST CARTER FOR 1ST PAPER FILING FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY FORREST CARTER; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • ADA LETTER MAILED OUT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170109-0608 $255.00; 170109-0608-CK Reference Number 1475

    Read MoreRead Less