This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 13:03:46 (UTC).

NEDD -V- CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES OF SAN BERNARDINO

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 NEDD -V- CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES OF SAN BERNARDINO was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1355

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LA'TARA L. NEDD

Respondent

CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES OF SAN BERNARDINO

 

Court Documents

STATUS HEARING ON PETITION; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

STATUS HEARING ON PETITION; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA JOANIS; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT CHRISTIAN HERNANDEZ; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:52; PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL NOT PRESENT.; COURT ORDERS THIS MATTER SET FOR ORDER SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $90.00; SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT TODAYS HEARING AND ALSO $50.00 FOR FAILING TO; COMPLY WITH CRC 3.110(B). TOTAL AMOUNT OF SANCTIONS THAT MAY BE IMPOSED: $140.00.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : STATUS OF SERVICE COMPLETION SET FOR 02/01/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF TODAYS MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 08:53; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF SERVICE COMPLETION; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF SERVICE COMPLETION; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: ARLENE GUARDADO; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:36; COURT NOTES PLAINTIFF LATARA L. NEDD FAILED TO APPEAR ON 01/02/18 AND HAS FAILED TO APPEAR FOR; A SECOND TIME FOR TODAYS HEARING.; COURT WILL CONTINUE THIS MATTER FOR THE LAST TIME AND SET IT FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING; REGARDING WHY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $280.00 SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR PLAINTIFFS FAILURES TO; APPEAR.; FAILURE TO APPEAR A 3RD TIME MAY RESULT IN DISMISSAL OF THIS ACTION AS COURT MAY DEEM; MATTER TO HAVE BEEN SETTLED OR ABANDONED.; HEARING IS SET AS FOLLOWS:; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : SANCTIONS/SERVICE COMPLETION/DISMISSAL SET FOR 03/09/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL 02/01/18 MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 08:37; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2018
  • RETURN MAIL: MINUTE ORDER RECEIVED BACK FROM LATARA L. NEDD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS/SERVICE COMPLETION/DISMISSAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: ILAYALI WADE; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:37; THE COURT NOTES PLAINTIFF HAS FAILED TO APPEAR ON JANUARY 2, 2018 AND FEBRUARY 1, 2018 IN ADDITION; TO TODAYS HEARING.; COURT ORDERS ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. REASON: FAILURE TO APPEAR/FAILURE TO PROSECUTE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; 08:38; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER DATED 3/9/18 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF SERVICE COMPLETION; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: ARLENE GUARDADO; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:36; COURT NOTES PLAINTIFF LATARA L. NEDD FAILED TO APPEAR ON 01/02/18 AND HAS FAILED TO APPEAR FOR; A SECOND TIME FOR TODAYS HEARING.; COURT WILL CONTINUE THIS MATTER FOR THE LAST TIME AND SET IT FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING; REGARDING WHY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $280.00 SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR PLAINTIFFS FAILURES TO; APPEAR.; FAILURE TO APPEAR A 3RD TIME MAY RESULT IN DISMISSAL OF THIS ACTION AS COURT MAY DEEM; MATTER TO HAVE BEEN SETTLED OR ABANDONED.; HEARING IS SET AS FOLLOWS:; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : SANCTIONS/SERVICE COMPLETION/DISMISSAL SET FOR 03/09/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL 02/01/18 MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 08:37; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • STATUS HEARING ON PETITION; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA JOANIS; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT CHRISTIAN HERNANDEZ; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:52; PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL NOT PRESENT.; COURT ORDERS THIS MATTER SET FOR ORDER SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $90.00; SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT TODAYS HEARING AND ALSO $50.00 FOR FAILING TO; COMPLY WITH CRC 3.110(B). TOTAL AMOUNT OF SANCTIONS THAT MAY BE IMPOSED: $140.00.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : STATUS OF SERVICE COMPLETION SET FOR 02/01/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF TODAYS MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 08:53; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON LA'TARA L. NEDD FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $380.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY LA'TARA L. NEDD IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CHANGE CASE CATEGORY FROM MPETL TO MPETM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • UPDATE CASE NAME.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • SET DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY LA'TARA L. NEDD.

    Read MoreRead Less