This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/27/2021 at 10:53:07 (UTC).

NCSTAR, INC. -V- DOES 1 THROUGH 50

Case Summary

On 01/31/2019 NCSTAR, INC filed an Intellectual Property - Other Intellectual Property lawsuit against DOES 1 THROUGH 50. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Garza, Donna Gunnell. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3308

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Other Intellectual Property

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Garza, Donna Gunnell

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

CONV

 

Court Documents

NOTICE IMAGED

01/31/2019: NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

01/31/2019: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

01/31/2019: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

01/31/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

01/31/2019: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ST

07/30/2019: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ST

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

08/01/2019: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

 

Docket Entries

08/30/2019

DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:DISMISSAL (PLA FTA 7/31/19)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2019

DocketOrder to Show Cause - Predisposition; Original Type: Order to Show Cause - Predisposition; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:DISMISSAL (PLA FTA 7/31/19)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2019

FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20190802-0201; ConversionPayment; $3.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2019

FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $3.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2019

FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20190801-0408; ConversionPayment; $6.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2019

FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $6.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2019

DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY NCSTAR, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION FOR FAX FEE 190801-0408-VS FAX/ 6.00 PAYMT 190801-0408-VS REFERENCE NUMBER 0330142641567

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Return of Document(s); Comment: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2019

DocketDocument is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Comment: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): NO HRG ON CALENDAR CASE WAS DISMISSED AT RECENT HRG FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2019

DocketLegacy Minutes; Judicial Officer: Garza, Donna Gunnell; Comment: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE DONNA GUNNELL GARZA,JUDGE CLERK: AMIE ARROYO COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON;7079 COURT ATTENDANT C LOCKMAN - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD THERE BEING NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, THE COURT ORDERS THIS MATTER SET FOR: AN OSC RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR. FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE OSC WILL RESULT IN THE DISMISSAL OF THIS MATTER. COUNSEL IS ORDERED TO FILE A DECLARATION REGARDING THEIR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THIS HEARING OR THIS MATTER WILL BE DISMISSED AT THE OSC. - HEARINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : DISMISSAL (PLA FTA 7/31/19) SET FOR 08/30/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S24. NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL 7/31/19 MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END ===

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
01/31/2019

FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2019

FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $444.00; Total Payments and Credits: $444.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2019

DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY NCSTAR, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION FOR FIRST PAPER FEE 190131-0597-CK CVH/ 435.00 PAYMT 190131-0597-CK REFERENCE NUMBER #D3667127

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2019

DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S24

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2019
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2019

DocketPlaintiff First Paper Fee Previously Paid in Full; Comment: PLAINTIFF NCSTAR, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less