This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/27/2018 at 19:56:45 (UTC).

NATURE TECH LANDSCAPING -V- VERSA LANDSCPAE

Case Summary

On 03/01/2010 NATURE TECH LANDSCAPING filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VERSA LANDSCPAE. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1912

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATURE TECH LANDSCAPING, INC.

Defendants and Cross Defendants

LAND ENGINEERING INC

VERSA LANDSCAPE, INC.

JOHN HARRISON KAY SR

HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

CHAFFEY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITYCOMPANY

PRO WEST PCM, INC.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

PRO WEST PCM, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CUMMINS & WHITE

2424 S.E. Bristol Street Suite 300

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

JUDKINS, GLATT, & HULME LLP

5505 Cancha De Golf

Rancho Santa Fe, CA 92091

BEST BEST & KRIEGER

One Corporate Plaza 3500 Porsche Way Suite 200

Ontario, CA 91764

LANAK & HANNA

625 The City Drive South Ste 190

Orange, CA 92868

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2012
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2012
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2012
  • OSC RE: MEDIATION / CMC; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; GILBERT OCHOA, JUDGE; CLERK: NANCY CARDOZA; COURT REPORTER DEENA MACIAS 9826; COURT ATTENDANT D ZWIERLEIN; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY IMAN REZA APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR NATURE TECH LANDSCAPING, INC..; ATTORNEY DAVID H. GETZ APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR PRO WEST PCM, INC., HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY.; BEST BEST & KRIEGER FOR CHAFFEY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT NOT PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: VERSA LANDSCAPE, INC.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PARTIES INDICATE MEDIATION IS SET FOR 2/10/12.; COURT SETS THIS MATTER FOR TRIAL.; HEARINGS:; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 07/26/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R8; FOR TRIAL BEGINNING 07/30/12.; TRIAL ESTIMATE IS 5 DAY JURY TRIAL.; JURY FEES ARE TO BE POSTED AT LEAST 25 DAYS PRIOR TO TRIAL DATE. FAILURE TO POST JURY FEES WILL BE DEEMED A WAIVER OF JURY TRIAL.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY NATURE TECH LANDSCAPING, INC..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY PRO WEST PCM, INC., HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2011
  • ORDER STRIKE VERSA LANDSCAPE INCS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT A ND CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2011
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: MARY NUSS; COURT REPORTER FRED BERZAK 5815; COURT ATTENDANT L SKOPHAMMER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY IMAN REZA APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR NATURE TECH LANDSCAPING, INC..; ATTORNEY BENJAMIN KEARNS PRESENT FOR CHAFFEY COMMUNITY COLLEGE.; ATTORNEY DAVID GETZ APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR PRO WEST PCM, INC., HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY.; PROCEEDINGS:; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HELD.; BY AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES.; THE COURT ORDERS THE MATTER TO PROCEED TO MEDIATION.; CASE REFERRED TO PRIVATE MEDIATION; MEDIATION TO BE COMPLETED BY 01/17/12.; EACH PARTY IS TO SHARE IN THE COSTS OF MEDIATION.; HEARINGS:; OSC RE: MEDIATION/CMC SET FOR 01/30/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R8; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2011
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STRIKE PLDGS OF VERSA TO COMPLAINT & X-COMPLAINT; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: MARY NUSS; COURT REPORTER FRED BERZAK 5815; COURT ATTENDANT L SKOPHAMMER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY IMAN REZA APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR NATURE TECH LANDSCAPING, INC..; ATTORNEY BENJAMIN KEARNS PRESENT FOR CHAFFEY COMMUNITY COLLEGE.; ATTORNEY DAVID GETZ APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR PRO WEST PCM, INC., HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR OSC RE: STRIKE ANSWER OF VERSA LANDSCAPE.; COUNSEL STATE THE OSC NOTICE WAS SERVED ON VERSA LANDSCAPE REGARDING STRIKING THE ANSWER TO THE; COMPLAINT AND CROSS COMPLAINT.; COURT FINDS:; ANSWER OF VERSA LANDSCAPE, INC. ORDERED STRICKEN.; ANSWER OF VERSA LANDSCAPE, INC. ORDERED STRICKEN.; THE COURT FURTHER STATES THE PARTY IS SUBJECT TO A DEFAULT NOW.; PLAINTIFFS TO PREPARE NOTICE OF RULING AND ORDER.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2011
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY NATURE TECH LANDSCAPING, INC..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2011
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY PRO WEST PCM, INC..

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2010
  • ANSWER FILED BY CHAFFEY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT; PARTY REPRESENTED BY BEST BEST & KRIEGER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2010
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITYCOMPANY SERVED ON 03/18/10 WITH FEES OF $54.97.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2010
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO CHAFFEY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT SERVED ON 03/16/10 WITH FEES OF $54.97.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2010
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO PRO WEST PCM, INC. SERVED ON 03/23/10 WITH FEES OF $85.97.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED AS TO HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. PARTY SERVED ON 03/15/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $93.90.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2010
  • VACATE OSCSV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/01/10 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R8.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2010
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO VERSA LANDSCAPE, INC. SERVED ON 03/23/10 WITH FEES OF $60.97.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2010
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 03/01/2010 OF NATURE TECH LANDSCAPING, INC. - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2010
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 100301-1124 $355.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R8

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.