This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/14/2018 at 09:20:19 (UTC).

NATNISHA ANTOINETTA WINKFIELD-N-MARIO BANKS

Case Summary

On 05/31/2017 NATNISHA ANTOINETTA WINKFIELD-N-MARIO BANKS was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4974

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NATNISHA ANTOINETTA WINKFIELD

Respondent

MARIO BANKS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT -- DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 12/10/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • NOTICE/JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 05/31/2017 OF NATNISHA WINKFIELD FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 05/31/2017 OF NATNISHA WINKFIELD ORDERED ENTERED 09/12/17; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION FILED ON 08/25/17 BY NATNISHA ANTOINETTA WINKFIELD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • JUDGMENT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): INCOMPLETE FORMS FL-170 #8, FL-180 #4(L-M) PLEASE CORRECT AND RESUBMIT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY NATNISHA ANTOINETTA WINKFIELD FOR BOTH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST MARIO BANKS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 05/31/2017 OF NATNISHA WINKFIELD AS TO MARIO BANKS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY NATNISHA ANTOINETTA WINKFIELD

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY NATNISHA ANTOINETTA WINKFIELD FOR FORMS 7D; Minutes; Receipt: 170731-0045 $6.51

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS/PETITION/IE/PROP/DEC.OF DISCLOSURE FILED AS TO MARIO BANKS. PARTY SERVED ON 06/09/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY NATNISHA ANTOINETTA WINKFIELD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY NATNISHA ANTOINETTA WINKFIELD IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON NATNISHA ANTOINETTA WINKFIELD FOR FIRST APP FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S49

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.