This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 16:18:12 (UTC).

NAT'L COLLEGIATE -V- ASTA

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 NAT'L COLLEGIATE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ASTA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2084

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST

Defendant

CHRIS J ASTA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF PATENAUDE & FELIX A.P.C

4545 Murphy Canyon Road 3Rd Fl

San Diego, CA 92123

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION RE: VENUE FILED BY NATIONAL COLLEGIATESTUDENT LOAN TRUST

DECLARATION RE: VENUE FILED BY NATIONAL COLLEGIATESTUDENT LOAN TRUST

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 170206-0555 $240.00; 170206-0555-CK Reference Number 117939

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • VACATE OSCD1 HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 02/06/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: VENUE FILED BY NATIONAL COLLEGIATESTUDENT LOAN TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 170206-0555 $240.00; 170206-0555-CK Reference Number 117939

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.