This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2018 at 08:42:48 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR VS GUTIERREZ

Case Summary

On 07/12/2010 NATIONSTAR filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GUTIERREZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Chino District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0375

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chino District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC ITS ASSIGNEES AND

Defendant

SANDRA GUTIERREZ

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCARTHY & HOLTHUS

1770 Fourth Ave

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

ANYIA, ALFRED O

5653 1/2 Cahuenga Blvd.

North Hollywood, CA 91607

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2010
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: JULIE FRANCIS; BAILIFF: J. COLLINS; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC ITS ASSIGNEES AND; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; 08:30; THE COURT RECEIVED A TELEPHONE CALL FROM ATTORNEY KEVIN MELLO THIS DATE WHO INDICATED HE WAS; SPECIALLY APPEARING ON BEHALF OF THE PLAINTIFF IN THIS MATTER AND REQUESTED THAT THE CASE BE; DISMISSED. MR. MELLO INDICATED THERE WOULD BE NO APPEARANCES BY THE PARTIES.; ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: REQUEST OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2010
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUED TRIAL FILED BY NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC ITS ASSIGNEES AND.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2010
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: JULIE FRANCIS; BAILIFF: J. COLLINS; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY RATHA KEA PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 12/03/10 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT C1.; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY PLAINTIFF.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2010
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUED TRIAL FILED BY NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC ITS ASSIGNEES AND.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2010
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: JULIE FRANCIS; BAILIFF: J. COLLINS; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY NILUFAR ALEMOZAFFAR PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL REQUESTS TWO WEEK CONTINUANCE.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 10/22/10 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT C1.; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY PLAINTIFF.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2010
  • FILING FEE PAID BY NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC ITS ASSIGNEES AND FOR COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 100923-1993 $3.50; 100923-1993-CK Reference Number 2692

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2010
  • REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:30 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2010
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2010
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/12/2010 OF NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC ITS ASSIGNEES AND AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/27/10 WITH FEES OF $100.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2010
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2010
  • VACATE SCUD HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/10/10 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT C1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2010
  • CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 024-0096584001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2010
  • ANSWER FILED BY SANDRA GUTIERREZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY ALFRED O ANYIA.; Minutes; Receipt: 100802-0157 $220.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2010
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO POST SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 100726-2780 $20.00; 100726-2780-CK Reference Number 127438

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2010
  • FILING FEE PAID BY NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC ITS ASSIGNEES AND FOR COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 100715-1571 $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2010
  • 9/10/10 9:00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2010
  • 9/10/10 9:00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2010
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 100712-3173 $235.00; 100712-3173-CK Reference Number 126552

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT C1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant